Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0444454

EP0444454 - Air-drying polyurethane resins, their preparation and use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  12.03.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Surface Specialties Germany GmbH & Co. KG
Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Rheingaustrasse 190-196
65203 Wiesbaden / DE
[2004/17]
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
Solutia Germany GmbH & Co. KG
Boelckestrasse 26
55252 Mainz-Kastel / DE
Former [1999/20]For all designated states
Vianova Resins GmbH & Co. KG
Boelckestrasse 26
55252 Mainz-Kastel / DE
Former [1991/36]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schwab, Michael, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Jahnstrasse 33-35
W-6272 Niedernhausen-Oberjosbach / DE
02 / Walz, Gerd, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Pfingstbornstrasse 99
W-6200 Wiesbaden-Breckenheim / DE
03 / Merten, Gerhard, Dr. Dipl.-Ing.
Barbarossastrasse 27
W-6200 Wiesbaden / DE
[1991/36]
Representative(s)Deckers, Hellmuth Alexander
European Patent Attorney Breitbachstrasse 15
55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/17]Deckers, Hellmuth, Dr.
European Patent Attorney, Bahnhofstrasse 26/A
55218 Ingelheim / DE
Former [2003/23]Deckers, Hellmuth, Dr.
Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Postfach 3540
65174 Wiesbaden / DE
Former [2003/01]Zounek, Nikolai, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle Albert, Gebäude H391 Rheingaustrasse 190-196
65174 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date91101748.108.02.1991
[1991/36]
Priority number, dateDE1990400465115.02.1990         Original published format: DE 4004651
[1991/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0444454
Date:04.09.1991
Language:DE
[1991/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0444454
Date:26.02.1992
Language:DE
[1992/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0444454
Date:30.11.1994
Language:DE
[1994/48]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0444454
Date:28.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.1992
ClassificationInternational:C08G18/08, C08G18/10, C08G18/28, C08G18/58, C09D5/00, C09D175/04
[1991/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1991/36]
TitleGerman:Lufttrocknende Polyurethanharze, deren Herstellung und Verwendung[1991/36]
English:Air-drying polyurethane resins, their preparation and use[1991/36]
French:Résines de polyuréthane sèchant à l'air, leur préparation et leur utilisation[1991/36]
Examination procedure24.06.1992Examination requested  [1992/34]
05.11.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.05.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.1994Fee for grant paid
19.08.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  29.08.1995  08.09.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
P.O. Box 9300
NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL
 [1995/42]
09.10.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.02.1996Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.03.1996Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
16.09.1996Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
10.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.1997Reply to a communication from the opposition division
23.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.1998Reply to a communication from the opposition division
20.04.1999Date of oral proceedings
17.05.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
03.03.2003Reply to a communication from the opposition division
21.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
31.03.2003Reply to a communication from the opposition division
24.07.2003Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.08.2003Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.11.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
01.03.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition06.07.1999Appeal received No.  T0690/99
17.09.1999Statement of grounds filed
30.10.2002Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
30.10.2002Date of oral proceedings
08.11.2002Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
18.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR28.02.1999
CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
ES09.02.2002
SE09.02.2002
BE28.02.2002
DK28.02.2002
[2004/38]
Former [2004/23]GR28.02.1999
CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
SE09.02.2002
BE28.02.2002
DK28.02.2002
ES01.12.2003
Former [2004/09]GR28.02.1999
CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
SE09.02.2002
BE28.02.2002
DK28.02.2002
Former [2003/48]CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
GR09.02.2002
SE09.02.2002
BE28.02.2002
DK28.02.2002
Former [2003/45]CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
GR09.02.2002
SE09.02.2002
DK28.02.2002
Former [2003/19]CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
GR09.02.2002
SE09.02.2002
Former [2002/46]CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
SE09.02.2002
Former [2002/02]CH29.02.2000
LI29.02.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2030803  ;
 [A]GB2127829  ;
 [A]EP0219677  ;
 [AD]US3412054