Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0444454 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0444454



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 586
18.03.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
17.03.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
17.03.2004 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
05.03.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
05.03.2004 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
05.03.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
05.03.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
21.02.2004 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
21.02.2004 Claims Opposition 4
21.02.2004 Claims Opposition 4
21.02.2004 Claims Opposition 4
21.02.2004 Claims Opposition 3
21.02.2004 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
21.02.2004 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
21.02.2004 Request for change of name Opposition 6
21.02.2004 Translation of the claims Opposition 4
21.02.2004 Translation of the claims Opposition 4
21.02.2004 Translation of the claims Opposition 4
21.02.2004 Translation of the claims Opposition 3
19.02.2004 Claims Opposition 3
19.02.2004 Claims Opposition 4
19.02.2004 Claims Opposition 4
19.02.2004 Claims Opposition 4
19.02.2004 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
19.02.2004 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 16
19.11.2003 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
19.11.2003 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
19.11.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
19.11.2003 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
06.11.2003 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
14.08.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.08.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.08.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.08.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.08.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.08.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.07.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
29.07.2003 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.07.2003 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 1
24.07.2003 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
24.07.2003 Text intended for grant Opposition 10
22.04.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
31.03.2003 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Opposition 1
31.03.2003 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2003 Request for change of representative Opposition 1
21.03.2003 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
17.03.2003 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.03.2003 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
04.03.2003 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 5
04.03.2003 Claims Opposition 2
04.03.2003 Claims Opposition 2
04.03.2003 Description Opposition 1
04.03.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.03.2003 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.03.2003 Claims Opposition 2
03.03.2003 Claims Opposition 2
03.03.2003 Description Opposition 1
03.03.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.12.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
30.12.2002 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
19.12.2002 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
13.12.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
13.12.2002 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.11.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
08.11.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
08.11.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
08.11.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.11.2002 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
30.10.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.10.2002 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 38
30.10.2002 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
25.07.2002 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.07.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 2
22.07.2002 Annex Appeal 4
22.07.2002 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Appeal 4
22.07.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Appeal 1
22.07.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.07.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
16.07.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
16.07.2002 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
12.07.2002 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
24.05.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.05.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
10.02.2000 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.02.2000 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
30.09.1999 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.09.1999 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
27.09.1999 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.09.1999 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.09.1999 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
15.07.1999 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
06.07.1999 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.07.1999 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
06.07.1999 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
26.05.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
26.05.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.05.1999 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.05.1999 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
17.05.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
17.05.1999 Annex to a communication Opposition 2
17.05.1999 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
17.05.1999 Claims Opposition 1
17.05.1999 Claims Opposition 1
17.05.1999 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 2
17.05.1999 General authorisation Opposition 1
17.05.1999 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
17.05.1999 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.1999 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.1999 Text intended for grant Opposition 22
04.05.1999 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
09.04.1999 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
08.04.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.04.1999 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
06.04.1999 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
06.04.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.03.1999 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
05.02.1999 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 1
05.02.1999 Request for assignment Opposition 1
19.08.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.08.1998 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.08.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
12.08.1998 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.08.1998 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
06.08.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
06.08.1998 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
22.07.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.07.1998 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
16.07.1998 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.07.1998 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.07.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
16.07.1998 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.07.1998 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
12.05.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.04.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
24.04.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
01.04.1998 Description Opposition 3
01.04.1998 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.02.1998 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
03.02.1998 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.12.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
23.12.1997 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 4
08.08.1997 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
08.08.1997 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.08.1997 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 4
10.04.1997 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
10.04.1997 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 4
12.11.1996 Claims Opposition 2
12.11.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
20.09.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
20.09.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.09.1996 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
16.09.1996 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
24.07.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
19.07.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.07.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
08.05.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.05.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.05.1996 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.03.1996 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
21.02.1996 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
19.02.1996 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
09.10.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
09.10.1995 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
07.09.1995 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.09.1995 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
30.08.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.08.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
29.08.1995 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
20.10.1994 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
19.08.1994 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.08.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.08.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.08.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.08.1994 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
20.05.1994 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
14.05.1994 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
25.04.1994 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
25.04.1994 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
06.04.1994 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 3
14.03.1994 Claims Search / examination 4
14.03.1994 Claims Search / examination 4
14.03.1994 Description Search / examination 5
14.03.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.03.1994 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 15
05.11.1993 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.01.1992 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.01.1992 European search report Search / examination 2
15.03.1991 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
22.02.1991 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
08.02.1991 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.02.1991 Claims Search / examination 3
08.02.1991 Claims Search / examination 4
08.02.1991 Description Search / examination 16
08.02.1991 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.1991 Priority document Search / examination 21
08.02.1991 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5