Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0447848

EP0447848 - Scanner calibration method and apparatus for generating defined amplitudes of scattered light [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 01.07.2009  [2009/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TENCOR INSTRUMENTS
2400 Charleston Road
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[1994/42]
Former [1992/15]For all designated states
TET TECHNO INVESTMENT TRUST SETTLEMENT
c/o IPR Management Services AG, Bahnstrasse 33
FL-9494 Schaan / LI
Former [1991/39]For all designated states
TET TECHNO INVESTMENT TRUST SETTLEMENT
c/o IPR Management Services AG, Bahnstrasse 33
FL-9494 Schaan / LI
Inventor(s)01 / Malin, Cosmas
Lutzfeld 333
FL-9493 Mauren / LI
02 / Hoyle, Philip
Rhaetikonstrasse 5
FL-9490 Vaduz / LI
[1991/39]
Representative(s)Fiener, Josef , et al
Patentanw. J. Fiener et col.
P.O. Box 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/27]Fiener, Josef , et al
Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
Former [2002/37]Fiener, Josef , et al
Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49
87712 Mindelheim / DE
Former [1995/01]Fiener, Josef
Patentanwälte Kahler, Käck, Fiener & Sturm P.O. Box 12 49
D-87712 Mindelheim / DE
Former [1994/42]OK pat AG
Hinterbergstrasse 36, Postfach 5254
CH-6330 Cham / CH
Former [1992/15]Kägi, Otto Patentanwalt
St. Jakobstrasse 48 Postfach 201
CH-6330 Cham / CH
Former [1991/39]Hotz, Klaus, Dipl.-El.-Ing./ETH Patentanwalt
c/o OK pat AG Hinterbergstrasse 36 Postfach 5254
CH-6330 Cham / CH
Application number, filing date91102967.627.02.1991
[1991/39]
Priority number, dateCH1990000068505.03.1990         Original published format: CH 68590
[1991/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0447848
Date:25.09.1991
Language:DE
[1991/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0447848
Date:01.07.1992
Language:DE
[1992/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0447848
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.1992
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/88, G01N21/47
[1991/39]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1991/39]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Kalibrieren von Scannern und Anordnung zum Erzeugen definierter Streulichtamplituden[1991/39]
English:Scanner calibration method and apparatus for generating defined amplitudes of scattered light[1991/39]
French:Procédé pour calibrer des scanneurs et appareil pour générer des amplitudes définis de lumière diffusée[1991/39]
Examination procedure11.11.1992Examination requested  [1993/02]
06.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
25.01.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.05.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.2002Fee for grant paid
31.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Request for further processing for:04.08.2000Request for further processing filed
04.08.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.09.2000Decision despatched
22.12.1997Request for further processing filed
22.12.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
19.01.1998Decision despatched
25.01.1996Request for further processing filed
25.01.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
19.02.1996Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
24.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
17.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
26.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
05.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 10
04.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 11
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200111   M06   Fee paid on   04.05.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT11.09.2002
CH28.02.2003
LI28.02.2003
[2008/02]
Former [2004/01]CH28.02.2003
LI28.02.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0200918  ;
 [A]EP0146005  ;
 [AD]US4314763  (STEIGMEIER EDGAR F, et al);
 [AD]US4512659  (GALBRAITH LEE K [US], et al)
ExaminationUS4360275