blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0450373

EP0450373 - Loading mechanism for guns, especially armoured howitzers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.1994
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KUKA Wehrtechnik GmbH
Zugspitzstrasse 140
D-86165 Augsburg / DE
[1991/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Jörg, Josef, Dr.
Garmischer Strasse 27a
W-8900 Augsburg / DE
02 / Bobinger, Rudolf
Burgstrasse 19
W-8851 Nordendorf / DE
03 / Eyb, Wolfgang
Justinius-Kerner-Strasse 5
W-7250 Leonberg / DE
[1991/41]
Representative(s)Lichti, Heiner
Lichti - Patentanwälte
Postfach 41 07 60
76207 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/01]Lichti, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60
D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE
Former [1991/41]Lichti, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60
D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date91104084.816.03.1991
[1991/41]
Priority number, dateDE1990401084504.04.1990         Original published format: DE 4010845
[1991/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0450373
Date:09.10.1991
Language:DE
[1991/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0450373
Date:02.02.1994
Language:DE
[1994/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.1991
ClassificationIPC:F41A9/16, F41A9/42
[1991/45]
CPC:
F41A9/42 (EP,US); F41A9/16 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1991/41]F41A9/16
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/41]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Laden von Rohrwaffen, insbesondere von Panzerhaubitzen[1991/41]
English:Loading mechanism for guns, especially armoured howitzers[1991/41]
French:Mécanisme de chargement pour canons, notamment pour obusiers blindés[1991/41]
Examination procedure16.03.1992Examination requested  [1992/21]
26.07.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.08.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.1993Fee for grant paid
28.10.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE02.02.1994
DK02.02.1994
ES02.02.1994
GR02.02.1994
IT02.02.1994
SE02.02.1994
CH31.03.1994
LI31.03.1994
LU31.03.1994
[2002/25]
Former [2000/05]BE02.02.1994
DK02.02.1994
GR02.02.1994
IT02.02.1994
SE02.02.1994
CH31.03.1994
LI31.03.1994
LU31.03.1994
Former [1999/42]BE02.02.1994
DK02.02.1994
IT02.02.1994
SE02.02.1994
CH31.03.1994
LI31.03.1994
Former [1998/15]BE02.02.1994
DK02.02.1994
SE02.02.1994
CH31.03.1994
LI31.03.1994
Former [1997/17]BE02.02.1994
SE02.02.1994
CH31.03.1994
LI31.03.1994
Former [1997/16]BE02.02.1994
SE02.02.1994
CH31.03.1994
LI31.03.1994
Former [1995/03]BE02.02.1994
SE02.02.1994
CH31.03.1994
LI31.03.1994
Former [1994/49]BE02.02.1994
SE02.02.1994
Former [1994/45]SE02.02.1994
Documents cited:Search[A]US2474975  (GOODHUE WILLIAM V);
 [A]FR1015102  (SCHNEIDER & CIE);
 [A]US3120785  (LORIMER JOHN D, et al);
 [A]DE2501426  (BOFORS AB);
 [A]FR2424507  (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.