blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0449144

EP0449144 - Catalyst composition for hydrotreating of hydrocarbons and hydrotreating process using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COSMO OIL COMPANY, LTD
No. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
Petroleum Energy Center
2-3-22, Azabudai Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1991/40]For all designated states
COSMO OIL COMPANY, LTD
No. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
PETROLEUM ENERGY CENTER
2-3-22, Azabudai
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yoshinari, Tomohiro
3-32-25-201, Moto-machi
Urawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Usui, Kazushi
1-62-10, Iwana
Noda-shi, Chiba-ken / JP
03 / Yamamoto, Yasuo
2856-1, Ohsawa
Koshigaya-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
04 / Ohi, Mitsuru
4-20-3-107, Hanaguri
Souka-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
[1991/40]
Representative(s)Wächtershäuser, Günter
Wächtershäuser & Hartz
Patentanwälte
Ottostrasse 4
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/40]Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr.
Patentanwalt, Tal 29
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date91104569.822.03.1991
[1991/40]
Priority number, dateJP1990008596730.03.1990         Original published format: JP 8596790
[1991/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0449144
Date:02.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0449144
Date:21.11.1991
Language:EN
[1991/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0449144
Date:27.07.1994
Language:EN
[1994/30]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0449144
Date:26.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.1991
ClassificationIPC:C10G45/12
[1991/40]
CPC:
C10G45/12 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [1991/40]
TitleGerman:Katalytische Zusammensetzung für die Hydrobehandlung von Kohlenwasserstoffen und Hydrobehandlungsverfahren unter Anwendung dieser Zusammensetzung[1991/40]
English:Catalyst composition for hydrotreating of hydrocarbons and hydrotreating process using the same[1991/40]
French:Composition catalytique pour l'hydrotraitement d'hydrocarbures et procédé d'hydrotraitement en utilisant cette composition[1991/40]
Examination procedure29.04.1992Examination requested  [1992/27]
21.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.03.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.01.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.04.1994Fee for grant paid
26.04.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.04.1995  08.05.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
van Deursen, Petrus Hubertus
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Intellectual Property Department
P.O. Box 9300
6800 SB Arnhem / NL
 [N/P]
Former [1995/26]
Opponent(s)01  26.04.1995  08.05.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Van Deursen, Petrus Hubertus
Akzo Patent Department P.O. Box 9300
NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL
02.06.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.12.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.12.1997Date of oral proceedings
27.01.1998Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.01.1998Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.02.1998Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.10.2002Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
22.01.2003Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition25.03.1998Appeal received No.  T0289/98
05.06.1998Statement of grounds filed
06.09.2002Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
06.09.2002Date of oral proceedings
16.09.2002Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0216938  (CATALYSTS & CHEM IND CO [JP]);
 [A]EP0050911  (STANDARD OIL CO [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.