Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0449324

EP0449324 - Ink jet recording apparatus and pump mechanism for use therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.1998
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 12.02.2003  [2003/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1991/40]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ikado, Masaharu, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Ara, Yoji, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1997/26]
Former [1991/40]01 / Ikado, Masaharu, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Ara, Masaharu, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Tiedtke, Harro , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/06]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Former [1991/40]Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte, Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams, Bavariaring 4
W-8000 München 2 / DE
Application number, filing date91105099.528.03.1991
[1991/40]
Priority number, dateJP1990008108630.03.1990         Original published format: JP 8108690
JP1990009540711.04.1990         Original published format: JP 9540790
JP1990009548111.04.1990         Original published format: JP 9548190
JP1990009597811.04.1990         Original published format: JP 9597890
[1991/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0449324
Date:02.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0449324
Date:25.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.1991
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/165
[1991/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1997/11]
Former [1991/40]BE,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  NL 
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät und dazugehöriger Pumpmechanismus[1991/40]
English:Ink jet recording apparatus and pump mechanism for use therewith[1991/40]
French:Appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre équipé d'une pompe[1991/40]
Examination procedure17.02.1992Examination requested  [1992/16]
25.11.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.02.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.09.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.06.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.1996Fee for grant paid
05.09.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
25.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES25.06.1997
NL25.06.1997
[2003/07]
Former [2002/25]ES25.06.1997
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP0375407  ;
 [A]DE3040055  ;
 [A]DE3725673