Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0507972

EP0507972 - Bar code reading systems having electrical power conservation and laser radiation power limiting means [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.02.1996
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PHOTOGRAPHIC SCIENCES CORPORATION
770 Basket Road Webster
New York 14580 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/42]For all designated states
PHOTOGRAPHIC SCIENCES CORPORATION
770 Basket Road
Webster, New York 14580 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Eastman, Jay
25 Arlington Drive
Pittsford, N.Y. 14534 / US
[1992/42]
Representative(s)Haibach, Tino , et al
Patentanwälte
Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp
Postfach 12 11 20
80035 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/42]Haibach, Tino, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte, Wallach, Koch, Dr. Haibach, Feldkamp, Postfach 12 11 20
D-80035 München / DE
Application number, filing date91105595.209.04.1991
[1992/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0507972
Date:14.10.1992
Language:EN
[1992/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.1991
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/10
[1992/42]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1992/50]
Former [1992/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Strichcodelesevorrichtung mit elektrischer Energieeinsparung und mit Mitteln zum Begrenzen von Laserstrahlungsleistung[1992/42]
English:Bar code reading systems having electrical power conservation and laser radiation power limiting means[1992/42]
French:Systèmes lecteurs de codes à barres à économie d'énergie électrique et avec des moyens pour limiter la puissance de radiation du laser[1992/42]
Examination procedure10.04.1992Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
15.07.1992Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, GR, LU
15.04.1993Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1996/15]
02.08.1993Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1996/15]
Appeal following examination11.02.1994Appeal received No.  J0008/94
15.04.1994Statement of grounds filed
09.03.1995Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M03) [1995/10]
14.06.1995Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/24]
07.12.1995Result of appeal procedure: rejection of appeal
07.12.1995Date of oral proceedings
12.12.1995Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Request for re-establishment of rights:06.08.1993Date of receipt
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.05.1992AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.1992GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.05.1992LU   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.05.1993M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.199303   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.1993
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0193762  ;
 [YD]US4639606  ;
 [Y]US4694182  ;
 [A]EP0364676  ;
 [Y]JPS5566060
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4no. 110 (P-022)8 August 1980 & JP-A-55 066 060 ( KOKUSAI ELECTRIC CO LTD ) 19 May 1980
 [A]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE vol. 26, no. 5, October 1983page 2660; DICKSON: 'PULSE-TRAIN-MODE OPTICAL SCANNER'