blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0515705

EP0515705 - Frying pans [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.1996
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MEYER MANUFACTURING CO., LTD
382 Kwun Tong Road Kowloon
HONG KONG / HK
[1992/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Cheng, Stanley Kin Sui
c/o Meyer Manufact. Co. Ltd., 382 Kwun Tong Road
Kowloon, Hong Kong / HK
[1992/49]
Representative(s)Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/49]Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R 0AE / GB
Application number, filing date91106998.718.08.1987
[1992/49]
Priority number, dateGB1986002112001.09.1986         Original published format: GB 8621120
[1992/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0515705
Date:02.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0515705
Date:13.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.09.1992
ClassificationIPC:A47J37/10, A47J36/02
[1992/49]
CPC:
A47J37/10 (EP,KR,US); A47J37/04 (KR); A47J36/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1992/49]
TitleGerman:Bratpfanne[1992/49]
English:Frying pans[1992/49]
French:Poêle à frire[1992/49]
Examination procedure30.04.1991Examination requested  [1992/49]
02.08.1991Request for decision received: (all rights)
28.08.1991Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request rejected
31.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
16.02.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
23.02.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.1995Fee for grant paid
19.05.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination29.10.1991Appeal received No.  J0003/92
03.01.1992Statement of grounds filed
06.08.1992Result of appeal procedure: allowance of appeal
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP87307307.6  / EP0259056
Opposition(s)14.09.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
11.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 07
09.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 08
09.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.09.199105   M06   Fee paid on   14.01.1992
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2618258  (KOBS KROYER KARL KRISTIAN);
 [Y]DE1934269U  (ALCAN ALUMINIUMWERKE [DE]);
 [A]DE2950604  (RITTER ALUMINIUM GMBH [DE]);
 [A]DE3423472  (BRAUN & KEMMLER [DE]);
 [A]CH274184  (KROYER K K K [DK]);
 [A]US1757989  (ACTON CLARE S);
 [A]US3473952  (MCFADDEN JAMES A);
 [AD]GB372025  (BELLS ASBESTOS AND ENGINEERING, et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.