EP0460451 - Process for the preparation of alpha-hydroxymethyl-ketals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/50] | Process for the preparation of alpha-hydroxymethylacetals and alpha-hydroxymethyl-ketals | ||
[1995/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hermeling, Dieter, Dr. Zum Ordenswald 73 f W-6730 Neustadt / DE | [1991/50] | Application number, filing date | 91108248.5 | 22.05.1991 | [1991/50] | Priority number, date | DE19904017575 | 31.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4017575 | DE19904017576 | 31.05.1990 Original published format: DE 4017576 | [1991/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0460451 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0460451 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C25B3/02 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
C25B3/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von alpha-Hydroxymethyl-ketalen | [1995/19] | English: | Process for the preparation of alpha-hydroxymethyl-ketals | [1995/19] | French: | Procédé de production d'alpha-hydroxyméthyl-kétals | [1995/19] |
Former [1991/50] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von alpha-Hydroxymethylacetalen und alpha-Hydroxymethyl-ketalen | ||
Former [1991/50] | Process for the preparation of alpha-hydroxymethylacetals and alpha-hydroxymethyl-ketals | ||
Former [1991/50] | Procédé de production d'alpha-hydroxyméthylacétals et d'alpha-hydroxyméthyl-kétals | Examination procedure | 06.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 30.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR NATURFORSCHUNG, Teil B, Band 31B, Nr. 2, 1976, Seiten 175-177; B.F. BECKER et al.: "Elektrochemische Synthesen, V. Die anodische alpha-Hydroxylierung von Isobutyraldehyd" | [AP] - TETRAHEDRON, Band 47, Nr. 4/5, 28. Januar 1991, Seiten 895-905, Pergamon Press plc; G.I. NIKISHIN et al.: "Electrochemical oxidation of ketones in methenol in the presence of alkali metal bromides" |