Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0463489

EP0463489 - Source of welding current, especially source of current for arc-welding, with additional sets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.09.1995
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.1995Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 25.10.1995 [1995/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MESSER LINCOLN GMBH
Lärchenstrasse 137
65933 Frankfurt / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/01]For all designated states
MESSER LINCOLN GMBH
Lärchenstrasse 137
D-65933 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ems, Herbert
Schlossstrasse 2
W-6093 Flörsheim / DE
[1992/01]
Representative(s)Roesner, Werner
Geierfeld 45
65812 Bad Soden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/01]Roesner, Werner
Geierfeld 45
D-65812 Bad Soden / DE
Application number, filing date91109690.713.06.1991
[1992/01]
Priority number, dateDE1990402014325.06.1990         Original published format: DE 4020143
[1992/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0463489
Date:02.01.1992
Language:DE
[1992/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0463489
Date:16.12.1992
Language:DE
[1992/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.1992
ClassificationInternational:G05D27/02, B23K9/10
[1992/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/01]
TitleGerman:Schweissstromquelle, insbesondere Lichtbogen-Schweissstromquelle, mit Zusatzgeräten[1993/24]
English:Source of welding current, especially source of current for arc-welding, with additional sets[1992/01]
French:Source de courant de soudage, notamment source de courant de soudage à l'arc et agrégat additionnel[1992/01]
Former [1992/01]Schweissstromquelle, insbesondere Lichtbogen-Schweissstromquelle, mit Zusatsgeäten
File destroyed:03.03.2001
Examination procedure02.06.1993Examination requested  [1993/32]
30.11.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.1995Application withdrawn by applicant  [1995/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
09.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.199303   M06   Fee paid on   07.07.1993
30.06.199505   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE3827383  ;
 [X]US4527045  ;
 [X]DE3322678  ;
 [A]EP0356988  ;
 [A]US4767913  ;
 [A]DE3445981