Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0464452

EP0464452 - Semiconductor integrated circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
For all designated states
TOSHIBA MICRO-ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
25-1, Ekimaehoncho Kawasaki-ku
Kawasaki-shi / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP
For all designated states
TOSHIBA MICRO-ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
25-1, Ekimaehoncho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi / JP
Former [1995/01]For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA
72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
TOSHIBA MICRO-ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
25-1, Ekimaehoncho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi / JP
Former [1992/02]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi / JP
For all designated states
TOSHIBA MICRO-ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
25-1, Ekimaehoncho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Terashima, Kaoru, c/o Intellectual Property Div.
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP
02 / Ishikawa, Kazuo, c/o Intellectual Property Div.
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP
[1992/02]
Representative(s)Lehn, Werner , et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
81904 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/02]Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20
D-81904 München / DE
Application number, filing date91109945.518.06.1991
[1992/02]
Priority number, dateJP1990016141621.06.1990         Original published format: JP 16141690
[1992/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0464452
Date:08.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0464452
Date:01.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0464452
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.1992
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/02
[1992/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/02]
TitleGerman:Integrierte Halbleiterschaltung[1992/02]
English:Semiconductor integrated circuit[1992/02]
French:Circuit intégré à semi-conducteur[1992/02]
Examination procedure18.06.1991Examination requested  [1992/02]
30.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.07.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.1999Fee for grant paid
01.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
11.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
01.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
10.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]JP59043563  ;
 [A]EP0255125  (NEC CORP [JP]);
 [A]EP0033154  (SIEMENS AG [DE])
 [A]  IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN vol. 27, no. 6, November 1984, ARMONK, N. Y., USA page 3344; V. L. RIDEOUT ET AL.: 'SELECTIVE SUBSTRATE BIASING FOR CMOS CIRCUITS',
 [A]  PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 131 (E-251)(1568) 19 June 1984 & JP-A-59 043 563 ( OLYMPUS ) 10 March 1984,