blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0464587

EP0464587 - Method of layer stripping to predict subsurface stress regimes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.06.1996
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
1635 Market Street Philadelphia
Pennsylvania 19103 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/19]For all designated states
CHEVRON U.S.A. Inc.
1635 Market Street
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US
Former [1992/23]For all designated states
CHEVRON RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY COMPANY
555 Market Street
San Francisco, California 94105 / US
Former [1992/02]For all designated states
CHEVRON RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY COMPANY
555 Market Street
San Francisco, California 94105 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Winterstein, Donald F.
1594 North Dorothy Drive
Brea, California 92621 / US
[1992/02]
Representative(s)Meyer, Ludgerus, et al
Patentanwälte
Meyer & Partner GbR
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/02]Meyer, Ludgerus A., Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwalt Jungfernstieg 38
D-20354 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date91110442.025.06.1991
[1992/02]
Priority number, dateUS1990054399426.06.1990         Original published format: US 543994
[1992/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0464587
Date:08.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/02]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0464587
Date:24.02.1993
Language:EN
[1993/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0464587
Date:23.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.1993
ClassificationIPC:G01V1/28
[1992/02]
CPC:
G01V1/284 (EP,US); G01V1/42 (EP,US); G01V2210/626 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/02]
TitleGerman:Trennschichtverfahren zum Vorhersagen von unterirdischen Spannungsregimen[1992/02]
English:Method of layer stripping to predict subsurface stress regimes[1992/02]
French:Procédé de séparation de couches pour prédire des régimes de contraintes sous-surface[1992/02]
Examination procedure26.02.1993Examination requested  [1993/17]
10.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.10.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.1994Fee for grant paid
23.12.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
22.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
09.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.08.1995
BE23.08.1995
CH23.08.1995
IT23.08.1995
LI23.08.1995
NL23.08.1995
SE23.11.1995
DE24.11.1995
[2008/02]
Former [2003/07]AT23.08.1995
BE23.08.1995
CH23.08.1995
IT23.08.1995
LI23.08.1995
NL23.08.1995
SE23.11.1995
DE24.11.1995
Former [1999/42]AT23.08.1995
BE23.08.1995
CH23.08.1995
IT23.08.1995
LI23.08.1995
SE23.11.1995
DE24.11.1995
Former [1997/13]AT23.08.1995
BE23.08.1995
CH23.08.1995
LI23.08.1995
SE23.11.1995
DE24.11.1995
Former [1996/22]AT23.08.1995
BE23.08.1995
SE23.11.1995
DE24.11.1995
Former [1996/14]AT23.08.1995
SE23.11.1995
DE24.11.1995
Documents cited:Search[A]US4298966  (RUEHLE WILLIAM H);
 [A]EP0169076  (AMOCO CORP [US]);
 [A]EP0291388  (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]);
 [A]EP0297737  (CONOCO INC [US])
 [A]  - GEOPHYSICS. vol. 55, no. 4, April 1990, TULSA US pages 470 - 479 WINTERSTEIN ET AL. 'Velocity anisotropy in shale determined from crosshole and vertical seismic profile data'
 [A]  - GEOPHYSICS. vol. 54, no. 11, November 1989, TULSA US pages 1420 - 1429 SQUIRES ET AL. 'Interpretation of total wave-field data over Lost Hills field, Kern County, California.'
 [A]  - GEOPHYSICS. vol. 50, no. 1, January 1985, TULSA US pages 142 - 152 STUART CRAMPIN 'Evaluation of anysotropy by shear-wave splitting'
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.