blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0469290

EP0469290 - Threaded insert for use on a drywall [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1992/06]Structure of a threaded insert for use on a drywall
[1994/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.1995
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.04.1995 [1995/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chern, Tsun-Ping
313-1, Chang Yuan Road Hua Tan Hsiang
Changhua / TW
[N/P]
Former [1992/06]For all designated states
Chern, Tsun-Ping
313-1, Chang Yuan Road
Hua Tan Hsiang, Changhua / TW
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1992/06]
Representative(s)Tiedtke, Harro, et al
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1994/08]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Former [1992/06]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
D-80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date91110469.325.06.1991
[1992/06]
Priority number, dateUS1990054333326.06.1990         Original published format: US 543333
[1992/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0469290
Date:05.02.1992
Language:EN
[1992/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0469290
Date:13.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.1991
ClassificationIPC:F16B13/04, F16B13/00
[1992/06]
CPC:
F16B13/002 (EP); F16B13/02 (EP); F16B25/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1992/06]
TitleGerman:Einsatzteil mit Gewinde für die Anwendung an einer Trockenmauer[1994/15]
English:Threaded insert for use on a drywall[1994/15]
French:Insert avec filetage à utiliser en maçonnerie sèche[1994/15]
Former [1992/06]Anordnung eines Einsatzteiles mit Gewinde für die Anwendung an einer Trockenmauer
Former [1992/06]Structure of a threaded insert for use on a drywall
Former [1992/06]Structure pour insert avec filetage à utiliser en maçonnerie sèche
Examination procedure04.08.1992Examination requested  [1992/40]
19.05.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.09.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.12.1993Fee for grant paid
30.12.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.01.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]US126366  ;
 [AD]GB231155  (WILJO NESTOR KAERNAE);
 [AD]DE1225529  (SALEWA LEDERWARENFABRIK GES MI);
 [A]DE2850123  (ITW DE FRANCE);
 [A]DE3108010  (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]);
 [A]DE3346704  (RICHTER SYSTEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]);
 [AD]EP0165674
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.