blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0472886

EP0472886 - Process and device for the continuous tempering of cacao butter containing masses, especially masses of chocolate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.07.1998
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sollich GmbH & Co. KG
Postfach 629
D-32102 Bad Salzuflen / DE
[1992/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Sollich, Helmut
Karschau 54
W-2341 Rabenkirchen / DE
[1992/10]
Representative(s)Rehberg, Elmar
Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Postfach 31 62
37021 Göttingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/45]Rehberg, Elmar, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 62
D-37021 Göttingen / DE
Former [1992/10]Rehberg, Elmar, Dipl.-Ing.
Am Kirschberge 22
D-37085 Göttingen / DE
Application number, filing date91112013.718.07.1991
[1992/10]
Priority number, dateDE1990402742930.08.1990         Original published format: DE 4027429
[1992/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0472886
Date:04.03.1992
Language:DE
[1992/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0472886
Date:18.01.1995
Language:DE
[1995/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.1991
ClassificationIPC:A23G1/04, A23G1/18
[1992/10]
CPC:
A23G1/042 (EP,US); A23G1/18 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT [1992/10]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum kontinuierlichen Temperieren von kakaobutterhaltigen Massen, insbesondere Schokoladenmasse[1992/10]
English:Process and device for the continuous tempering of cacao butter containing masses, especially masses of chocolate[1992/10]
French:Procédé et appareil pour stabiliser la température de masses contenant du beurre de cacao, en particulier une masse de chocolat[1992/10]
Examination procedure12.02.1992Examination requested  [1992/16]
21.12.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.08.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.10.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
13.10.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.07.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.1994Fee for grant paid
12.10.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.10.1995  31.10.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Aasted-Mikroverk ApS
Bygmarken 9-17
DK-3520 Farum / DK
Opponent's representative
Heiden, Finn
Budde Schou A/S
Vester So̸gade 10
1601 Copenhagen V / DK
 [N/P]
Former [2009/29]
Opponent(s)01  17.10.1995  31.10.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Aasted-Mikroverk ApS
Bygmarken 9-17
DK-3520 Farum / DK
Opponent's representative
Heiden, Finn
Budde Schou A/S Vester So̸gade 10
1601 Copenhagen V / DK
Former [1997/47]
Opponent(s)01  17.10.1995  31.10.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Aasted-Mikroverk ApS
Bygmarken 9-17
DK-3520 Farum / DK
Opponent's representative
Heiden, Finn
Heiden & Höiberg AS, Nörre Farimagsgade 37
1364 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [1996/46]
Opponent(s)01  17.10.1995  31.10.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Aasted-Mikroverk ApS
Bygmarken 9-17
DK-3520 Farum / DK
Opponent's representative
Jeppesen, Finn Heiden
c/o Heiden & Hoeiberg AS Noerre Farimagsgade 37
1364 Copenhagen K / DK
Former [1995/49]
Opponent(s)01  17.10.1995  31.10.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Aasted-Mikroverk ApS
Bygmarken 9-17
DK-3520 Farum / DK
Opponent's representative
Jeppesen, Finn Heiden
c/o Heiden Patents ApS E.C. Hammersvej 15 st.
DK-2791 Dragoer / DK
21.11.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.12.1995Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.06.1996Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M01)
02.08.1996Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
30.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.1997Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.05.1998Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/34]
26.06.1998Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition25.09.1997Appeal received No.  T1051/97
10.12.1997Statement of grounds filed
27.01.1998Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M99) [1998/05]
19.05.1998Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
19.05.1998Date of oral proceedings
26.05.1998Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP60145050  ;
 [A]US4059047  (SOLLICH HELMUT);
 [AD]EP0289849  (SOLLICH GMBH & CO KG [DE]);
 [X]EP0339129  (SOLLICH GMBH & CO KG [DE])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Band 9, Nr. 306 (C-317)(2029), 3. Dezember 1985; & JP - A - 60145050 (MEIJI SEIKA K.K.) 31.07.1985, & JP60145050 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.