Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0472903

EP0472903 - Device for controlling or regulating lapping or polishing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.06.1994
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PETER WOLTERS AG
Büsumer Strasse 96
24768 Rendsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/10]For all designated states
PETER WOLTERS AG
Büsumer Strasse 96
D-24768 Rendsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wittstock, Gerhard
Heidredder 32
W-2082 Uetersen / DE
[1992/10]
Representative(s)Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 31 53
20431 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neuer Wall 50
20354 Hamburg / DE
Former [1992/10]Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring
Postfach 30 24 30
D-20308 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date91112369.324.07.1991
[1992/10]
Priority number, dateDE1990402762831.08.1990         Original published format: DE 4027628
[1992/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0472903
Date:04.03.1992
Language:DE
[1992/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1991
ClassificationInternational:B23Q15/08
[1992/10]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1992/10]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Steuerung oder Regelung von Läpp-, Hon- oder Poliermaschinen[1992/10]
English:Device for controlling or regulating lapping or polishing machines[1992/10]
French:Dispositif de commande ou régulation des bipolaires ou des machines à polir[1992/10]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure06.02.1992Examination requested  [1992/15]
01.02.1994Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1994/30]
03.03.1994Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1994/30]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.199303   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0307573  ;
 [A]EP0344548