Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0454190

EP0454190 - Semiconductor accelerometer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.01.1993
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.1993Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.03.1993 [1993/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD.
1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi
Aichi-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1991/44]For all designated states
NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD.
1-1, Showa-cho
Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Imai, Masahito
3-13-23,Teramotodai
Chita-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Yamada, Toshitaka
4-84, Donko-cho,Minato-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Mizuno, Tiaki
2-1236-144, Kamiike-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
04 / Shioya, Hirohito
Nishi Yamanoda 1, Sato-cho
Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[1992/04]
Former [1991/44]01 / Imai, Masahito
1-10-1, Takasu-cho
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
02 / Yamada, Toshitaka
4-84, Donko-cho,Minato-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
03 / Mizuno, Tiaki
2-1236-144, Kamiike-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
04 / Shioya, Hirohito
Nishi Yamanoda 1, Sato-cho
Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/44]KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
D-85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date91112438.615.09.1987
[1991/44]
Priority number, dateJP1986022412222.09.1986         Original published format: JP 22412286
JP1986022543723.09.1986         Original published format: JP 22543786
JP1986023222330.09.1986         Original published format: JP 23222386
JP1986026255704.11.1986         Original published format: JP 26255786
JP1986027799121.11.1986         Original published format: JP 27799186
JP1987021771830.08.1987         Original published format: JP 21771887
[1991/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0454190
Date:30.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0454190
Date:08.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1991
ClassificationInternational:G01P15/12
[1991/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1991/44]
TitleGerman:Halbleiterbeschleunigungsmesser[1991/44]
English:Semiconductor accelerometer[1991/44]
French:Accéléromètre semi-conducteur[1991/44]
Examination procedure09.07.1992Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1993/10]
09.10.1992Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1993/10]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP87113466.4  / EP0261555
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 03
17.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 04
17.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
11.08.1992M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0165148  ;
 [A]US3884085  ;
 [A]US3557628  ;
 [A]GB2130373  ;
 [A]JPS6169151
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10no. 236 (E-428)(2292) 15 August 1986 & JP-A-61 069 151 ( TOSHIBA ) 9 April 1986