blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0475078

EP0475078 - Controllable door check for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.1994
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.09.1994 [1994/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ED. Scharwächter GmbH & Co.KG.
Hohenhagenerstrasse 26-28
42855 Remscheid / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/12]For all designated states
ED. Scharwächter GmbH & Co.KG.
Hohenhagenerstrasse 26-28
D-42855 Remscheid / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klüting, Bernd-Alfred
Jung-Stilling-Weg 18
W-5608 Radevormwald / DE
02 / Grothe, Hermann
Barlachweg 12
W-5630 Remscheid / DE
[1992/12]
Representative(s)Schön, Theodor
Patent- und Zivilingenieur Sonnleiten 7
84164 Moosthenning / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/12]Schön, Theodor, Patent- und Zivilingenieur
Sonnleiten 7
D-84164 Moosthenning / DE
Application number, filing date91113243.907.08.1991
[1992/12]
Priority number, dateDE1990402551011.08.1990         Original published format: DE 4025510
[1992/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0475078
Date:18.03.1992
Language:DE
[1992/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0475078
Date:06.10.1993
Language:DE
[1993/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.1991
ClassificationIPC:E05C17/20
[1992/12]
CPC:
E05C17/203 (EP); E05B47/00 (EP); E05C17/003 (EP)
Designated contracting statesES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1992/12]
TitleGerman:Steuerbarer Kraftwagentürfeststeller[1992/12]
English:Controllable door check for vehicle[1992/12]
French:Arrêt de porte contrôlable[1992/12]
Examination procedure07.08.1991Examination requested  [1992/12]
17.12.1991Request for accelerated examination filed
27.05.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.1992Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
22.06.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.01.1993Fee for grant paid
14.01.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.02.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)07.07.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.199303   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.1993
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4335911  ;
 [A]EP0321649
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.