blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0475175

EP0475175 - Back panel connection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.1995
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.04.1995 [1995/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/12]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
D-80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Thom, Günter
Untertaxetweg 6
W-8035 Gauting / DE
02 / Zell, Karl, Dipl.-Ing.
Moritz v. Schwind-Weg 80
W-8130 Niederpöcking / DE
[1992/12]
Application number, filing date91114254.526.08.1991
[1992/12]
Priority number, dateDE19900012949U11.09.1990         Original published format: DE 9012949 U
[1992/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0475175
Date:18.03.1992
Language:DE
[1992/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0475175
Date:13.04.1994
Language:DE
[1994/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.1992
ClassificationIPC:H05K7/14, H01R23/68
[1992/12]
CPC:
H01R13/6588 (EP,US); H01R13/6581 (EP,US); H05K7/1451 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1992/12]
TitleGerman:Rückwandverdrahtung[1992/12]
English:Back panel connection[1992/12]
French:Connection à la paroi arrière[1992/12]
Examination procedure24.07.1992Examination requested  [1992/39]
18.08.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.10.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.1993Fee for grant paid
16.12.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.01.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4550362  (REIMER WILLIAM A [US]);
 [A]EP0195955  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0203404  (SIEMENS AG [DE])
 [A]  - ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING. Bd. 57, Nr. 699, März 1985, LONDON GB Seite 116; 'Schroff speeds up back-plane connection'
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.