blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0475243

EP0475243 - Stack mold with insulated runner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.1994
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Husky Injection Molding Systems Ltd.
530 Queen Street South
Bolton, ON L7E 5S5 / CA
[N/P]
Former [1992/12]For all designated states
HUSKY INJECTION MOLDING SYSTEMS LTD.
530 Queen Street South
Bolton Ontario L7E 5S5 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Schad, Robert D.
101 Russel Hill Road
Toronto, Ontario M4V 2S9 / CA
02 / Akselrund, Vitaly
19 Hiram Road
Richmond Hill, Ontario L4C 9E6 / CA
03 / Disimone, John
97 Wycliffe Avenue
Woodbridge, Ontario L4L 3N4 / CA
[1992/12]
Representative(s)Weiss, Peter
Dr. Weiss & Arat
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Postfach 12 50
78229 Engen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/12]Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer.nat.
Dr. Peter Weiss & Partner Postfach 12 50
D-78229 Engen / DE
Application number, filing date91114821.103.09.1991
[1992/12]
Priority number, dateUS1990057726204.09.1990         Original published format: US 577262
[1992/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0475243
Date:18.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0475243
Date:29.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.1992
ClassificationIPC:B29C45/40, B29C45/22
[1992/12]
CPC:
B29C45/27 (EP,US); B29C45/322 (EP,US); B29C45/38 (EP,US);
B29C2045/2795 (EP,US); B29C45/2602 (EP,US); B29C45/2756 (EP,US);
B29K2101/12 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/12]
TitleGerman:Etagenform mit isoliertem Einspritzkanal[1992/12]
English:Stack mold with insulated runner[1992/12]
French:Moule à plateaux avec un canal isolant[1992/12]
Examination procedure26.03.1992Request for accelerated examination filed
09.05.1992Examination requested  [1992/28]
22.06.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.06.1992Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
27.08.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
27.11.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
29.06.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
05.07.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.1993Fee for grant paid
13.10.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE29.12.1993
DK29.12.1993
ES29.12.1993
FR29.12.1993
GR29.12.1993
IT29.12.1993
NL29.12.1993
SE29.12.1993
[2006/14]
Former [2002/25]BE29.12.1993
DK29.12.1993
ES29.12.1993
GR29.12.1993
IT29.12.1993
NL29.12.1993
SE29.12.1993
FR20.05.1994
Former [2000/05]BE29.12.1993
DK29.12.1993
GR29.12.1993
IT29.12.1993
NL29.12.1993
SE29.12.1993
FR20.05.1994
Former [1999/42]BE29.12.1993
DK29.12.1993
IT29.12.1993
NL29.12.1993
SE29.12.1993
FR20.05.1994
Former [1998/15]BE29.12.1993
DK29.12.1993
NL29.12.1993
SE29.12.1993
FR20.05.1994
Former [1995/08]BE29.12.1993
NL29.12.1993
SE29.12.1993
FR20.05.1994
Former [1995/03]BE29.12.1993
SE29.12.1993
FR20.05.1994
Former [1994/48]BE29.12.1993
SE29.12.1993
Former [1994/43]SE29.12.1993
Documents cited:Search[A]US4599064  (LANDIS H RICHARD [US], et al);
 [A]US4867668  (MIYAIRI KAZUKI [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.