blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0480173

EP0480173 - Fuel injection pump for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.11.1995
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.1995 [1995/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/16]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fehlmann, Wolfgang, Ing.
Im Steingarten 25
W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE
02 / Braun, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Haldenrainstrasse 12
W-7257 Ditzingen / DE
03 / Junger, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Ebitzweg 1
W-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE
04 / Naumann, Werne, Ing.
Hauptstrasse 65
W-6686 Eppelborn / DE
[1994/51]
Former [1992/16]01 / Fehlmann, Wolfgang, Ing.
Im Steingarten 25
W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE
02 / Braun, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Haldenrainstrasse 12
W-7257 Ditzingen / DE
03 / Junger, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH)
Ebitzweg 1
W-7000 Stuttgart 50 / DE
04 / Naumann, Werner, Ing.
Hauptstrasse 65
W-6686 Eppelborn / DE
Application number, filing date91114895.504.09.1991
[1992/16]
Priority number, dateDE19900014068U10.10.1990         Original published format: DE 9014068 U
[1992/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0480173
Date:15.04.1992
Language:DE
[1992/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0480173
Date:28.12.1994
Language:DE
[1994/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.1992
ClassificationIPC:F02M41/12
[1992/16]
CPC:
F02M41/121 (EP); F02M41/125 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1992/16]
TitleGerman:Kraftstoffeinspritzpumpe für Brennkraftmaschinen[1992/16]
English:Fuel injection pump for internal combustion engine[1992/16]
French:Pompe d'injection de carburant pour moteurs à combustion interne[1992/16]
Examination procedure10.09.1992Examination requested  [1992/46]
24.11.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.1993Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.03.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.1994Fee for grant paid
03.06.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.09.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1943674  (ORANGE EINSPRITZGERAETE KG);
 [A]GB2192239  (DIESEL KIKI CO);
 [A]DE3913764  (DIESEL KIKI CO [JP]);
 [A]DE963825  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.