Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0477906

EP0477906 - Plasma processing apparatus using plasma produced by microwaves [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.1997
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/14]For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ohara, Kazuhiro
Hitachi Isogoryo, 17-21, Okamura-4-chome
Isogo-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP
02 / Otsubo, Toru
2-2-702, Kugenuma Higashi
Fujisawa-shi / JP
03 / Sasaki, Ichirou, Este Shiti Shonan Mutsuura 3-904
1950-21, Mutsuuracho
Kanazawa-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP
[1992/14]
Representative(s)Altenburg, Udo , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Altenburg, Udo , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [1992/14]Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date91116343.425.09.1991
[1992/14]
Priority number, dateJP1990025689328.09.1990         Original published format: JP 25689390
[1992/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0477906
Date:01.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0477906
Date:06.05.1992
Language:EN
[1992/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0477906
Date:11.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.1992
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/32, H05H1/46
[1992/19]
Former International [1992/14]H01J37/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/14]
TitleGerman:Plasma-Bearbeitungsgerät unter Verwendung eines mittels Mikrowellen erzeugten Plasmas[1992/14]
English:Plasma processing apparatus using plasma produced by microwaves[1992/14]
French:Appareil de traitement par plasma utilisant un plasma produit par microondes[1992/14]
Examination procedure25.09.1991Examination requested  [1992/14]
18.11.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.05.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.1996Fee for grant paid
22.07.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2017636  ;
 [Y]EP0273741  ;
 [YD]EP0264913
 [XD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 109 (E-727)(3457) 15 March 1989
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 161 (E-909)(4104) 28 March 1990 & JP-A-2 017 636 ( HITACHI LTD ) 22 January 1990, & JP2017636 A 19900122
    [ ] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS vol. 57, no. 4, 23 July 1990, NEW YORK USA pages 403 - 405; SEIJI SAMUKAWA ET AL: 'Extremely high-selective electron cyclotron resonance plasma etching for phosphorus doped polycrystalline silicon.'
ExaminationJP2017636
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 161 (E-909)(4104) 28 March 1990 & JP-A-2 017 636, & JP2017636 A 19900328