Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0479186

EP0479186 - Apparatus and method for producing ethylene polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.01.1996
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.02.1996 [1996/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phillips Petroleum Company
5th and Keeler Bartlesville
Oklahoma 74004 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/15]For all designated states
PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY
5th and Keeler
Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hottovy, John Douglas
2625 Chapel Hill Road
Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US
02 / Lowe, Barry W.
2500 Mountain Road
Bartlesville, OK 74003 / US
03 / Lawrence, Frederick Christopher
P.O. Box 262
Bartlesville, OK 74005 / US
04 / Fangmeier, James Stephen
3507 Henrietta Avenue
Bartlesville, OK 74006 / US
[1992/15]
Representative(s)Geissler, Bernhard , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 06 20
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/15]Geissler, Bernhard, Dr. jur., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20
D-81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date91116642.930.09.1991
[1992/15]
Priority number, dateUS1990059099501.10.1990         Original published format: US 590995
[1992/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0479186
Date:08.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0479186
Date:12.08.1992
Language:EN
[1992/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0479186
Date:01.03.1995
Language:EN
[1995/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.1992
ClassificationInternational:B01J19/24, B01J8/08, C08F10/02
[1992/33]
Former International [1992/15]C08F10/02, B01J19/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/15]
TitleGerman:Apparatur und Methode zur Herstellung von Äthylenpolymeren[1992/15]
English:Apparatus and method for producing ethylene polymer[1992/15]
French:Appareil et méthode de préparation de polymères d'éthylène[1992/15]
Examination procedure15.12.1992Examination requested  [1993/06]
28.09.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
01.09.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.09.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.1994Fee for grant paid
28.10.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.12.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.08.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US3257362