blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0481387

EP0481387 - Photosensor device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.11.1996
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.01.1997 [1997/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541 / JP
For all designated states
NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION
1-6 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
SUMIDEN OPCOM, LTD.
6-13, Omorinishi 7-chome, Ota-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/17]For all designated states
SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
For all designated states
NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION
1-6 Uchisaiwaicho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
SUMIDEN OPCOM, LTD.
6-13, Omorinishi 7-chome, Ota-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ozawa, Kazumasa, c/o Yokohama Works of
Sumitomo Elec.Ind.Ltd., 1, Taya-sho, Sakae-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Shigehara, Masakazu, c/o Yokohama Works of
Sumitomo Elec.Ind.Ltd., 1, Taya-sho, Sakae-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Komiya, Takeo, c/o Yokohama Works of
Sumitomo Elec.Ind.Ltd., 1, Taya-sho, Sakae-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
04 / Tomita, Nobuo, 1097.-4, Ishizuka
Johoku-cho, Higashi
Ibaraku-gun, Ibaraki / JP
05 / Arimoto, Kazuhiko, c/o Sumiden Opcom Ltd.
6-13, Omorinishi 7-chome, Ota-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1992/17]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/17]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date91117453.014.10.1991
[1992/17]
Priority number, dateJP1990027322215.10.1990         Original published format: JP 27322290
[1992/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0481387
Date:22.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0481387
Date:23.09.1992
Language:EN
[1992/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0481387
Date:24.01.1996
[1996/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.08.1992
ClassificationIPC:G01D5/26, G01B11/02
[1992/17]
CPC:
G01B11/026 (EP); G01D5/268 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1992/17]
TitleGerman:Optischer Fühler[1992/17]
English:Photosensor device[1992/17]
French:Capteur optique de mesures[1992/17]
Examination procedure29.10.1992Examination requested  [1992/52]
26.11.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.10.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.04.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.07.1995Fee for grant paid
13.07.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.10.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1997/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0291394  ;
 [X]US4681395  ;
 [X]WO8808959
 [XP]  - JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY vol. 9, no. 4, April 1991, 9NEW YORK pages 545 - 551; GANG HE, FRANK CUOMO: 'A LIGHT INTENSITY FUNCTION SUITABLE FOR MULTIMODE FIBER-OPTIC SENSORS'
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.