Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0482565

EP0482565 - Electrolytic process for stripping a metal coating from a titanium based metal substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Praxair S.T. Technology, Inc.
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, CT 06817-0001 / US
[1993/29]
Former [1992/18]For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE COATINGS SERVICE TECHNOLOGY CORP.
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, CT 06817-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sue, Jinjen Albert
10149 Partridge Place
Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US
[1992/18]
Representative(s)Schwan, Gerhard
Schwan Schwan Schorer
Patentanwälte
Bauerstrasse 22
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/18]Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Elfenstrasse 32
D-81739 München / DE
Application number, filing date91117942.221.10.1991
[1992/18]
Priority number, dateUS1990060092922.10.1990         Original published format: US 600929
[1992/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0482565
Date:29.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0482565
Date:23.09.1992
Language:EN
[1992/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0482565
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.1992
ClassificationInternational:C25F5/00
[1992/18]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1992/18]
TitleGerman:Elektrochemisches Verfahren zum Abziehen einer Metallbeschichtung von einem Metallsubstrat auf Titanbasis[1992/18]
English:Electrolytic process for stripping a metal coating from a titanium based metal substrate[1992/18]
French:Procédé électrochimique pour enlever un dépôt métallique d'un substrat à base de titane[1992/18]
Examination procedure29.10.1992Examination requested  [1992/52]
07.02.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.10.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.12.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.1999Fee for grant paid
28.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
19.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
16.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
05.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]SU639973  ;
 [AD]US4128463  (FORMANIK BERT J);
 [A]US3841983  (ITAI R, et al);
 [A]US3793172  (CADIEUX C)
 [A]  WORLD PATENTS INDEX Week 7939, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 79-71367B & SU-A-639 973 (GURINA T V) 30 December 1978,