Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0484727

EP0484727 - Method of producing a cheese and preparing it for distribution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2001
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA
Avenue Général-Guisan 70
1009 Pully / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA
Avenue Général-Guisan 70, P.O. Box 430
1009 Pully / CH
Former [1993/29]For all designated states
Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA
Avenue Général-Guisan 70
CH-1009 Pully / CH
Former [1992/27]For all designated states
Tetra Alfa Holdings S.A.
70, Avenue Général-Guisan
CH-1009 Pully / CH
Former [1992/20]For all designated states
Tetra Alfa Holdings S.A.
70, Avenue Général-Guisan
CH-1009 Pully / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Nielsen, John
Bogevej 3
DK-4653 Karise / DK
[1992/20]
Representative(s)Sundell, Håkan Oskar Anders , et al
AB Tetra Pak
Ruben Rausings gata
221 86 Lund / SE
[N/P]
Former [1993/29]Sundell, Hakan , et al
AB Tetra Pak Ruben Rausings gata
S-221 86 Lund / SE
Former [1992/20]Sundell, Hakan
AB Tetra Pak Ruben Rausings gata
S-221 86 Lund / SE
Application number, filing date91117970.322.10.1991
[1992/20]
Priority number, dateSE1990000354107.11.1990         Original published format: SE 9003541
[1992/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0484727
Date:13.05.1992
Language:EN
[1992/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0484727
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.1992
ClassificationInternational:A23C19/05, A23C19/028
[1992/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/20]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Käse und seine Vorbereitung zur Verteilung[1992/20]
English:Method of producing a cheese and preparing it for distribution[1992/20]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un fromage et sa préparation pour distribution[1992/20]
Examination procedure21.10.1992Examination requested  [1992/51]
30.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.01.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.04.2000Fee for grant paid
01.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
09.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
16.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
05.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Stay/Interruption12.04.1994Stay of proceedings
15.06.1999Resumption of proceedings
[1999/25]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.07.2000
BE12.07.2000
ES12.07.2000
SE12.10.2000
DE13.10.2000
LU22.10.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2002/25]AT12.07.2000
BE12.07.2000
ES12.07.2000
SE12.10.2000
DE13.10.2000
Former [2002/13]AT12.07.2000
BE12.07.2000
SE12.10.2000
DE13.10.2000
Former [2001/27]AT12.07.2000
BE12.07.2000
SE12.10.2000
Former [2001/22]AT12.07.2000
BE12.07.2000
Former [2001/17]AT12.07.2000
Documents cited:SearchWO8500501  [ ] (HANSEN JENS PETER AS [DK]);
 US4268528  [ ] (MONTIGNY JEAN);
 US4401679  [ ] (RUBIN JAN [DK], et al);
 US3899595  [ ] (STENNE PIERRE);
 EP0297676  [ ] (HOLLAND MELKUNIE [NL]);
 WO9100690  [ ] (MD FOODS AMBA [DK])