blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0485838

EP0485838 - Injection molded circuit boards by injection behind flexible circuits with thermoplastic materials [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.1996
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.10.1996 [1996/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/21]For all designated states
BAYER AG
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wolf, Gerhard Dieter, Dr.
Wilhelm-Busch-Strasse 29
W-4047 Dormagen 5 / DE
02 / Giesecke, Henning, Dr.
Düsseldorfer Strasse 49
W-5000 Köln 80 / DE
03 / Wank, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing.
Zülpicher Strasse 7
W-4047 Dormagen 5 / DE
[1992/21]
Application number, filing date91118730.004.11.1991
[1992/21]
Priority number, dateDE1990403659216.11.1990         Original published format: DE 4036592
[1992/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0485838
Date:20.05.1992
Language:DE
[1992/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0485838
Date:28.04.1993
Language:DE
[1993/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0485838
Date:18.10.1995
Language:DE
[1995/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.1993
ClassificationIPC:H05K3/20, H05K3/00
[1992/21]
CPC:
H05K3/0014 (EP,US); H05K1/0284 (EP,US); H05K3/181 (EP,US);
H05K1/0393 (EP,US); H05K2203/0709 (EP,US); H05K2203/1327 (EP,US);
H05K3/108 (EP,US); Y10S428/901 (EP,US); Y10T29/49128 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49155 (EP,US); Y10T29/49156 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1992/21]
TitleGerman:Spritzgegossene Leiterplatten durch Hinterspritzen von flexiblen Schaltungen mit thermoplastischen Materialien[1992/21]
English:Injection molded circuit boards by injection behind flexible circuits with thermoplastic materials[1992/21]
French:Plaques à circuit moulées par injection arrière de circuits flexibles par des matériaux thermoplastiques[1992/21]
Examination procedure22.07.1993Examination requested  [1993/38]
21.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
29.03.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.04.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.1995Fee for grant paid
02.06.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.07.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
13.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4772496  (MAEDA MASAHIKO [JP], et al);
 [YD]DE3627256  (BAYER AG [DE]);
 [YD]DE3840542  ;
 [AD]EP0067902  (DITTER UDO PRESS & SPRITZWERK [DE]);
 [A]DE1243746  (TELEFUNKEN PATENT)
 [A]  - FEINWERKTECHNIK + MESSTECHNIK Bd. 96, Nr. 3, März 1988, MUENCHEN DE Seiten 95 - 97 STEFFEN 'Additive Leiterplattenherstellung'
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.