Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0496965

EP0496965 - Press section [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.1996
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
J.M. Voith GmbH
St. Pöltener Strasse 43
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
[1992/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Schiel, Christian
Albrecht-Dürer-Strasse 90
W-7920 Heidenheim / DE
[1992/32]
Representative(s)Weitzel, Wolfgang , et al
Dr. Weitzel & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB
Friedenstrasse 10
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/32]Weitzel, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Friedenstrasse 10
D-89522 Heidenheim / DE
Application number, filing date91119700.219.11.1991
[1992/32]
Priority number, dateDE1991410235626.01.1991         Original published format: DE 4102356
[1992/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0496965
Date:05.08.1992
Language:DE
[1992/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0496965
Date:19.04.1995
Language:DE
[1995/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.1992
ClassificationInternational:D21F3/04, D21F3/02
[1992/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1992/32]
TitleGerman:Pressenpartie[1992/32]
English:Press section[1992/32]
French:Section de presse[1992/32]
Examination procedure03.06.1992Examination requested  [1992/32]
05.01.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.10.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.1994Fee for grant paid
13.12.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE19.04.1995
FR19.04.1995
NL19.04.1995
[2006/14]
Former [2003/11]BE19.04.1995
NL19.04.1995
FR15.09.1995
Former [2000/27]BE19.04.1995
FR15.09.1995
NL30.11.1995
Former [1996/05]BE19.04.1995
FR15.09.1995
Former [1996/01]FR15.09.1995
Documents cited:Search[A]US3861997  ;
 [AD]US4483745  ;
 [A]EP0334201  ;
 [A]DE3410171