Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0503143

EP0503143 - Casing closing cover [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  18.02.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CR Elastomere GmbH
Düsseldorfer Strasse 121
51379 Leverkusen / DE
[2000/14]
Former [1997/36]For all designated states
CR Elastomere GmbH
Düsseldorfer Strasse 121
D-51379 Leverkusen-Opladen / DE
Former [1994/48]For all designated states
GOETZE Elastomere GmbH
Düsseldorfer Strasse 121
D-51379 Leverkusen-Opladen / DE
Former [1992/38]For all designated states
GOETZE AG
Bürgermeister-Schmidt-Strasse 17
D-51399 Burscheid / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Ecker, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing.
Huflandstrasse 20
W-5090 Leverkusen 3 / DE
[1992/38]
Application number, filing date91120541.729.11.1991
[1992/38]
Priority number, dateDE1991410778211.03.1991         Original published format: DE 4107782
DE1991413431617.10.1991         Original published format: DE 4134316
[1992/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0503143
Date:16.09.1992
Language:DE
[1992/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0503143
Date:03.02.1993
Language:DE
[1993/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0503143
Date:25.01.1995
Language:DE
[1995/04]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0503143
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.1992
ClassificationInternational:F16M1/021, F02F7/00, F02F11/00
[1993/05]
Former International [1992/38]F16M1/021
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1992/38]
TitleGerman:Gehäuseverschlussdeckel[1992/38]
English:Casing closing cover[1992/38]
French:Couvercle de fermeture de carter[1992/38]
Examination procedure13.07.1993Examination requested  [1993/36]
25.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.07.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.1994Fee for grant paid
10.10.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.06.1995  07.07.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Firma Carl Freudenberg
Patente und Warenzeichen
D-69465 Weinheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Hering, Hartmut
Patentanwälte
Berendt, Leyh & Hering
Innere Wiener Strasse 20
81667 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1997/13]
Opponent(s)01  03.06.1995  07.07.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Firma Carl Freudenberg
Patente und Warenzeichen
D-69465 Weinheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Hering, Hartmut
Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20
81667 München / DE
Former [1995/31]
Opponent(s)01  03.06.1995  07.07.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Firma Carl Freudenberg
Patente und Warenzeichen
D-69465 Weinheim / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
04.12.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.03.1996Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.10.1996Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
01.07.1999Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.07.1999Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.10.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
18.10.1999Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition20.12.1996Appeal received No.  T0023/97
24.02.1997Statement of grounds filed
01.07.1999Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
01.07.1999Date of oral proceedings
09.07.1999Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
18.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:SearchDE3942448  [ ] (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]);
 DE3606052  [ ] (ZIKELI FRIEDRICH DIPL ING TH [DE]);
 DE3634735  [ ] (GOETZE AG [DE])