Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0494400

EP0494400 - Hand-tool with removable tool-holder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.06.1996
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.07.1996 [1996/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/29]For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
D-70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Buck, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Erlenweg 4
W-7440 Nürtingen / DE
02 / Wanner, Karl, Dr.-Ing.
Moltkestrasse 10
W-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
03 / Fehrle, Siegfried
Bernhäuser Strasse 55
W-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen 2 / DE
04 / Kabatnik, Wilfried, Dipl.-Ing.
Otto-Hahn-Weg 4
W-7022 Leinfelden-Echterdingen 1 / DE
[1992/29]
Application number, filing date91121400.513.12.1991
[1992/29]
Priority number, dateDE1991410018605.01.1991         Original published format: DE 4100186
[1992/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0494400
Date:15.07.1992
Language:DE
[1992/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0494400
Date:16.12.1992
Language:DE
[1992/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0494400
Date:02.08.1995
Language:DE
[1995/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.10.1992
ClassificationInternational:B23Q3/12, B25D17/08
[1992/51]
Former International [1992/29]B23Q3/12
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1992/29]
TitleGerman:Handwerkzeugmaschine mit abnehmbaren Werkzeughalter[1992/29]
English:Hand-tool with removable tool-holder[1992/29]
French:Outil à main avec porte-outil détachable[1992/29]
Examination procedure22.05.1993Examination requested  [1993/29]
09.11.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.01.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.1995Fee for grant paid
08.05.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.05.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP0265378  ;
 [Y]DE3421811  ;
 [A]DE3526162  ;
 [A]FR2349413