Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0493747

EP0493747 - Anti-contaminating adsorbed film and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.05.1997
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.07.1997 [1997/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1994/50]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Former [1992/28]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ogawa, Kazufumi
30-5, Higashi Nakafuri 1-chome
Hirakata-shi 573 / JP
02 / Mino, Norihisa
4-6-8-806, Senrioka Higashi
Settsu-shi 566, Osaka / JP
03 / Soga, Mamoru
1-22, Saikudani 1-chome, Tennoji-ku
Osaka-shi 543 / JP
[1992/28]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/28]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
D-80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date91121738.818.12.1991
[1992/28]
Priority number, dateJP1990040575425.12.1990         Original published format: JP 40575490
JP1991002402323.01.1991         Original published format: JP 2402391
[1992/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0493747
Date:08.07.1992
Language:EN
[1992/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0493747
Date:04.11.1992
Language:EN
[1992/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0493747
Date:10.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.1992
ClassificationInternational:C09D183/08, C08J7/04, B05D1/20
[1992/28]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/28]
TitleGerman:Nichtverunreinigender, absorbierter Film und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[1992/28]
English:Anti-contaminating adsorbed film and method of manufacturing the same[1992/28]
French:Film adsorbé non-contaminant et procédé de fabrication[1992/28]
Examination procedure27.10.1992Examination requested  [1992/52]
15.02.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.08.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.04.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.01.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.1996Fee for grant paid
21.03.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.04.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US4539061  (SAGIV JACOB [IL]);
 [X]EP0326438  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [X]EP0367438  (XAAR LTD [GB]);
 [E]EP0482613  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [E]EP0491251  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]);
 [A]FR2063190  (VEBREL ALFRED)