blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0475526

EP0475526 - Electromagnetic detection system for track vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.04.1993
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip28.04.1993Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.06.1993 [1993/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP
Oude Winterswijkseweg 7
NL-7141 DE Groenlo / NL
[N/P]
Former [1992/12]For all designated states
N.V. Nederlandsche Apparatenfabriek NEDAP
Oude Winterswijkseweg 7
NL-7141 DE Groenlo / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Saeys, Jan
Fabrieksstraat 26
NL-7151 BM Eibergen / NL
02 / Venema, Willem Hendrik Jacob
Louis Couperusstraat 12
NL-7131 Lichtenvoorde / NL
[1992/12]
Representative(s)Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al
Vereenigde Postbus 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [1992/27]Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97
NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL
Former [1992/12]Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir.
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux, P.O. Box 87930
NL-2508 DH 's-Gravenhage / NL
Application number, filing date91202287.806.09.1991
[1992/12]
Priority number, dateNL1990000196406.09.1990         Original published format: NL 9001964
[1992/12]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0475526
Date:18.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.1992
ClassificationIPC:B61L25/02, B61L25/04
[1992/12]
CPC:
B61L25/04 (EP); B61L25/025 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1992/12]
TitleGerman:Elektromagnetische Detektionsanlage für Gleisfahrzeuge[1992/12]
English:Electromagnetic detection system for track vehicles[1992/12]
French:Système de détection électromagnétique pour véhicules sur rails[1992/12]
File destroyed:07.08.2001
Examination procedure19.09.1992Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1993/24]
22.01.1993Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1993/24]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2207837  ;
 [A]WO8403264  ;
 [A]US2910579
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.