blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0442624
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2500079BGlobal Dossier 29.05.1996B2
JPH04330527 18.11.1992A
Priority number Date
CA2010068 14.02.1990
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0442624Global Dossier 04.11.1992A3
EP0442624 21.08.1991A2
Priority number Date
CA2010068 14.02.1990
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR9100573 29.10.1991A
Priority number Date
CA2010068 14.02.1990
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2010068 26.10.1993C
CA2010068 14.08.1991A1
Priority number Date
CA2010068 14.02.1990
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5339420 16.08.1994A
Priority number Date
CA2010068 14.02.1990