blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0442624

Designated contracting statesCH 
DE 
FR 
GB 
IT 
LI 
NL 
SE 
Examination procedure23.09.1996Application withdrawn by applicant  [1996/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
10.06.1993M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1993
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.199606   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:21.08.1991 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE
 
Event date:04.11.1992 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE
 
Event date:25.08.1993 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19930624
 
Event date:13.11.1996 
Event description:APPLICATION WITHDRAWN
[DO NOT USE]:19960923