Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0442624

EP0442624 - Partitioning case statements for optimal execution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  27.09.1996
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.1996Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 13.11.1996 [1996/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/34]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hoxey, Steven Murray
Heritage Hills Estates
RR1 Clarement, Ontario L0H 1EO / CA
[1991/34]
Representative(s)Blakemore, Frederick Norman
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/34]Blakemore, Frederick Norman
IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date91300525.223.01.1991
[1991/34]
Priority number, dateCA1990201006814.02.1990         Original published format: CA 2010068
[1991/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0442624
Date:21.08.1991
Language:EN
[1991/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0442624
Date:04.11.1992
Language:EN
[1992/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.1992
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/45
[1991/34]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1991/34]
TitleGerman:Unterverteilung von "Case"-Aufträgen für optimale Ausführung[1991/34]
English:Partitioning case statements for optimal execution[1991/34]
French:Partition de commandes "Case" pour exécution optimale[1991/34]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure24.06.1993Examination requested  [1993/34]
29.08.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
23.09.1996Application withdrawn by applicant  [1996/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 04
17.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
10.06.1993M01   Fee paid on   24.06.1993
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.199606   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]  SOFTWARE PRACTICE & EXPERIENCE. vol. 15, October 1985, CHICHESTER GB pages 1021 - 1024; ROBERT L. BERNSTEIN: 'Producing Good Code for the Case Statement'
 [A]  SOFTWARE PRACTICE & EXPERIENCE. vol. 11, 1981, CHICHESTER GB pages 929 - 942; ARTHUR. SALE: 'The Implementation of Case Statements in Pascal'
 [AD]  SOFTWARE PRACTICE & EXPERIENCE. vol. 12, 1982, CHICHESTER GB pages 879 - 882; J.HENNESSY: 'Compilation of the Pascal Case Statement'