Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0448284

EP0448284 - Bending device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.05.1996
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.07.1996 [1996/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KABUSHIKI KAISHA MACHIDA SEISAKUSHO
13-8, Honkomagome 6-chome Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[1991/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Chikama, Toshio
24-2, Maenocho 6-chome
Itabashi-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1991/39]
Representative(s)Votier, Sidney David , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
[1991/39]
Application number, filing date91302134.113.03.1991
[1991/39]
Priority number, dateJP1990006120114.03.1990         Original published format: JP 6120190
[1991/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0448284
Date:25.09.1991
Language:EN
[1991/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0448284
Date:09.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0448284
Date:19.07.1995
Language:EN
[1995/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.08.1991
ClassificationInternational:A61B1/00
[1991/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1991/39]
TitleGerman:Biege-Vorrichtung[1991/39]
English:Bending device[1991/39]
French:Dispositif d'articulation[1991/39]
Examination procedure26.09.1991Examination requested  [1991/48]
08.12.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.04.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.01.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.1995Fee for grant paid
06.02.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.04.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US3060972  ;
 [A]US3583393  ;
 [AD]JPS52631  ;
 [A]US3998216  ;
 [A]DE3534479