blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0450803

EP0450803 - Normalizing floating point processing unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2000
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/43]For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale, CA 94088-3453 / US
Former [1991/41]For all designated states
ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC.
901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453
Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gupta, Smeeta
2333 Stratford Drive
San Jose, California 95214 / US
02 / Perlman, Robert M.
2333 Stratford Drive
San Jose, California 95214 / US
03 / Lynch, Thomas W.
1717 East 32nd Street
Austin, Texas 78722 / US
04 / McMinn, Brian D.
918 Acorn Oaks Drive
Austin, Texas 78745 / US
[1991/41]
Representative(s)Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al
Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells
Kent TN4 8EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/41]Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al
BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn
London WC1V 6SE / GB
Application number, filing date91302417.020.03.1991
[1991/41]
Priority number, dateUS1990050381902.04.1990         Original published format: US 503819
[1991/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0450803
Date:09.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0450803
Date:14.10.1992
Language:EN
[1992/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0450803
Date:27.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.08.1992
ClassificationIPC:G06F7/48
[1991/41]
CPC:
G06F7/483 (EP,US); G06F7/49936 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/41]
TitleGerman:Gleitkomma-Verarbeitungseinheit mit Normalisierung[1991/41]
English:Normalizing floating point processing unit[1991/41]
French:Unité de calcul en virgule flottante avec normalisation[1991/41]
Examination procedure30.10.1992Examination requested  [1993/03]
06.12.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
12.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
25.02.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.1999Fee for grant paid
19.05.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.07.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
19.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
05.03.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
04.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.10.1999
BE27.10.1999
CH27.10.1999
ES27.10.1999
GR27.10.1999
IT27.10.1999
LI27.10.1999
NL27.10.1999
SE27.10.1999
DK27.01.2000
LU20.03.2000
[2008/02]
Former [2005/23]AT27.10.1999
BE27.10.1999
CH27.10.1999
ES27.10.1999
GR27.10.1999
LI27.10.1999
NL27.10.1999
SE27.10.1999
DK27.01.2000
LU20.03.2000
Former [2004/07]AT27.10.1999
BE27.10.1999
CH27.10.1999
ES27.10.1999
GR27.10.1999
LI27.10.1999
NL27.10.1999
SE27.10.1999
DK27.01.2000
Former [2003/45]AT27.10.1999
BE27.10.1999
CH27.10.1999
ES27.10.1999
LI27.10.1999
NL27.10.1999
SE27.10.1999
DK27.01.2000
Former [2003/07]AT27.10.1999
BE27.10.1999
CH27.10.1999
ES27.10.1999
LI27.10.1999
NL27.10.1999
SE27.10.1999
Former [2002/25]AT27.10.1999
BE27.10.1999
CH27.10.1999
ES27.10.1999
LI27.10.1999
SE27.10.1999
Former [2002/23]AT27.10.1999
BE27.10.1999
CH27.10.1999
LI27.10.1999
SE27.10.1999
Former [2000/52]AT27.10.1999
BE27.10.1999
CH27.10.1999
LI27.10.1999
Former [2000/51]AT27.10.1999
BE27.10.1999
CH02.02.2000
LI02.02.2000
Former [2000/50]BE27.10.1999
CH02.02.2000
LI02.02.2000
Former [2000/43]BE27.10.1999
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP62159224  ;
 [X]EP0097956  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 [A]EP0110160  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]);
 [XD]EP0180048  (IBM [US]);
 [A]EP0331372  (MIPS COMPUTER SYSTEMS INC [US]);
 [XP]US4916651  (GILL MICHAEL C [US], et al)
 [X]  - ELECTRONIC DESIGN, vol. 32, no. 10, 17 May 1984, WASECA, MN, DENVILLE, NJ, USA; pages 144 - 151; WINDSOR ET AL.: 'Arithmetic duo excels in computing floating-point products'
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 395 (P-650)24 December 1987 & JP-A-62 159 224 ( HITACHI LTD ) 15 July 1987, & JP62159224 A 19870715
 [A]  - ELECTRO 1988 CONFERENCE RECORD, vol. 13, no. 48/1, May 1988, LOS ANGELES, US; pages 1 - 8; PAUL S. RIES: 'An 8 Mflop floating-point coprocessor for a RISC microprocessor'
 [A]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 29, no. 11, April 1987, NEW YORK, US; pages 5076 - 5077; 'Multiple arithmetic processors within a functional co-processor'
    [ ] - MINI MICRO CONFERENCE RECORD, no. 16/6, November 1983, SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA; pages 1 - 4; GEORGE S. TAYLOR: 'ELXSI 6400 arithmetic processor'
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.