Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0449510


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.11.1998 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.01.1999 [1999/02]
05.12.1997 (Expected) grant published on  21.01.1998 [1998/04]
30.08.1997 Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.07.1997 Communication of intention to grant
18.07.1997 Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.03.1997 Renewal fee
27.02.1997 Communication of intention to grant
28.11.1996 Examination report or reply
15.10.1996 Examination report or reply
31.07.1996 Examination report or reply
16.03.1996 Renewal fee
15.03.1996 Examination report or reply
10.03.1993 First examination report
15.06.1992 Request for examination filed published on  05.08.1992 [1992/32]
14.11.1991 Publication of search report published on  02.01.1992 [1992/01]
15.08.1991 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.10.1991 [1991/40]