Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0449510

EP0449510 - Bloodless catheter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1991/40]Bloodless catheter with self-shielding needle
[1998/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.11.1998
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.01.1999 [1999/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CRITIKON, INC.
4110 George Road Tampa
Florida 33634 / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/40]For all designated states
CRITIKON, INC.
4110 George Road
Tampa Florida 33634 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lemieux, Francis P.
2978 Glenpark Road
Palm Harbor, Florida 34682 / US
[1991/40]
Representative(s)Fisher, Adrian John , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/40]Fisher, Adrian John , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date91302478.221.03.1991
[1991/40]
Priority number, dateUS1990049703122.03.1990         Original published format: US 497031
[1991/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0449510
Date:02.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0449510
Date:02.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0449510
Date:21.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.1991
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/06, A61M39/06
[1998/04]
Former International [1992/01]A61M5/32, A61M25/06, A61M39/00
Former International [1991/40]A61M25/06, A61M5/32
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1991/40]
TitleGerman:Blutstillender Katheter[1998/04]
English:Bloodless catheter[1998/04]
French:Cathéter hémostatique[1998/04]
Former [1991/40]Blutstillender Katheter mit selbstbeschirmender Nadel
Former [1991/40]Bloodless catheter with self-shielding needle
Former [1991/40]Cathéter hémostatique avec aiguille autoprotectrice
Examination procedure09.06.1992Examination requested  [1992/32]
12.03.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
21.11.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.07.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.1997Fee for grant paid
21.08.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.10.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
12.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0314470  ;
 [X]EP0352928  ;
 [Y]EP0029864  ;
 [Y]US4895346  ;
 [A]WO8906986  ;
 [A]EP0194886