Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0457548

EP0457548 - Computer aided positioning system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.1997
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.07.1997 [1997/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spectra Precision, Inc.
5475 Kellenburger Road Dayton
Ohio 45424-1099 / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/47]For all designated states
SPECTRA-PHYSICS LASERPLANE, INC.
5475 Kellenburger Road
Dayton, Ohio 45424-1099 / US
Inventor(s)01 / deVos, Leon B.C.
Kaag 9
3121 XE Schiedam / NL
02 / Schouten, Johannes N.TH. M.
Witte van Haemstedestraat 15
3122 HZ Vlaardingen / NL
[1991/47]
Representative(s)Murgatroyd, Susan Elizabeth , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/47]Murgatroyd, Susan Elizabeth , et al
Baron & Warren 18 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date91304314.714.05.1991
[1991/47]
Priority number, dateUS1990052274514.05.1990         Original published format: US 522745
[1991/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0457548
Date:21.11.1991
Language:EN
[1991/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0457548
Date:25.11.1992
Language:EN
[1992/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0457548
Date:17.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.1992
ClassificationInternational:G01C15/00, G01S5/16
[1992/48]
Former International [1991/47]G01C15/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [1991/47]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur rechnergestützten Positionierung[1991/47]
English:Computer aided positioning system and method[1991/47]
French:Système et méthode pour le positionnement assisté par ordinateur[1991/47]
Examination procedure18.04.1993Examination requested  [1993/25]
17.05.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.11.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.08.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.11.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.1996Fee for grant paid
26.02.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.04.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP607316  ;
 [X]JP6015508  ;
 [X]JP62254007  ;
 [A]JP60239612  ;
 [X]WO8701814  ;
 [A]US3458709
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 122 (P-359)(1845) 28 May 1985 & JP-A-60 7 316 ( ASAHI KOUGAKU KOGYO K.K. ) 16 January 1985, & JP607316 A 19850116
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 133 (P-362)(1856) 8 June 1985 & JP-A-60 15 508 ( KUBOTA TEKKO K.K. ) 26 January 1985, & JP6015508 A 19850126
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 129 (P-692)(2976) 21 April 1988 & JP-A-62 254 007 ( TOSHIHIRO TSUMURA ) 5 November 1987, & JP62254007 A 19871105
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 110 (P-450)(2167) 24 April 1986 & JP-A-60 239 612 ( KUBOTA TEKKO K.K. ) 28 November 1985, & JP60239612 A 19851128