Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0459761

EP0459761 - Three dimensional computer graphics employing ray tracking to compute form factors in radiosity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.08.1996
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US
Former [1991/49]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
P.O. Box 10301 3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto California 94303-0890 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wallace, John R.
119 Ithaca Road, Ithaca
New York 14850 / US
02 / Elmquist, Kells A.
3 Fiddlers Green, Lansing
New York 14882 / US
03 / Haines, Eric A.
110 Linden Avenue, Ithaca
New York 14850 / US
[1991/49]
Representative(s)Colgan, Stephen James , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/49]Colgan, Stephen James , et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date91304814.628.05.1991
[1991/49]
Priority number, dateUS1990053137731.05.1990         Original published format: US 531377
[1991/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0459761
Date:04.12.1991
Language:EN
[1991/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0459761
Date:14.07.1993
Language:EN
[1993/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.1993
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/72
[1991/49]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1991/49]
TitleGerman:Dreidimensionale Rechnergraphik mit Strahlabtastung zum Rechnen von Formfaktor in Radiosität[1991/49]
English:Three dimensional computer graphics employing ray tracking to compute form factors in radiosity[1991/49]
French:Calculateur graphique tridimensionnel employant le traçage de rayons pour calculer les facteurs de forme en radiosité[1991/49]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure08.10.1993Examination requested  [1993/49]
16.08.1996Application withdrawn by applicant  [1996/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
18.04.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.199606   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0251800