Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0460966

EP0460966 - Barrier film having high colorless transparency and method of manufacture thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 25.07.2007  [2007/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FLEX PRODUCTS, INC.
2793 Northpoint Parkway Santa Rosa
California 95407 / US
[N/P]
Former [1991/50]For all designated states
FLEX PRODUCTS, INC.
2793 Northpoint Parkway
Santa Rosa California 95407 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Phillips, Roger W.
466 Jacqueline Drive
Santa Rosa, California 95405 / US
02 / Wendt, Lauren R.
2737 Yuma Street
Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US
03 / Tan-Johnson, Myra
P.O. Box 750683
Petaluma, California 94975 / US
04 / Todd, David W.
619 Sparks Road
Sebastopol, California 95472 / US
[1991/51]
Former [1991/50]01 / Phillips, Roger W.
466 Jacqueline Drive
Santa Rosa, California 95405 / US
02 / Wendt, Lauren R.
2737 Yuma Street
Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US
03 / Tan-Johnson, Myra
6000 Roblar Road
Petaluma, California 94952 / US
04 / Todd, David W.
619 Sparks Road
Sebastopol, California 95472 / US
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/50]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date91305161.107.06.1991
[1991/50]
Priority number, dateUS1990053518308.06.1990         Original published format: US 535183
[1991/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0460966
Date:11.12.1991
Language:EN
[1991/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0460966
Date:04.01.1995
Language:EN
[1995/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0460966
Date:08.09.1999
Language:EN
[1999/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1994
ClassificationInternational:C23C14/08, C23C14/02, B32B27/08, B65D65/38, B32B27/02
[1995/01]
Former International [1991/50]C23C14/08, C23C14/02, B32B27/08, B65D65/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/50]
TitleGerman:Sperrfilm mit hoher farbloser Transparenz und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung[1999/36]
English:Barrier film having high colorless transparency and method of manufacture thereof[1991/50]
French:Film-barrière ayant une haute transparence incolore et méthode pour le fabriquer[1991/50]
Former [1991/50]Sperrfilm mit hoher farbloser Transparenz und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung
Examination procedure05.05.1995Examination requested  [1995/27]
17.10.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.1997Fee for grant paid
27.06.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.12.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.06.2000  20.06.2000  ADMISSIBLE
REXAM HIGH PERFORMANCE FLEXIBLES LTD.
Burrel Way, Thetford
Norfolk IP24 3QY / GB
Opponent's representative
Curtis, Philip Anthony
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
 02  07.06.2000  21.06.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
80636 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hertz, Oliver, et al
v. Bezold & Partner
Patentanwälte - PartG mbB
Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2002/23]
Opponent(s)01  07.06.2000  20.06.2000  ADMISSIBLE
REXAM HIGH PERFORMANCE FLEXIBLES LTD.
Burrel Way, Thetford
Norfolk IP24 3QY / GB
Opponent's representative
Curtis, Philip Anthony
A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
 02  07.06.2000  21.06.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
D-80636 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hertz, Oliver, Dr., et al
v. Bezold & Sozien, Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
Former [2000/31]
Opponent(s)01  07.06.2000  20.06.2000  ADMISSIBLE
REXAM HIGH PERFORMANCE FLEXIBLES LTD.
Burrel Way, Thetford
Norfolk IP24 3QY / GB
Opponent's representative
Curtis, Philip Anthony
A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
 02  07.06.2000  21.06.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V.
Leonrodstrasse 54
D-80636 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Lauermann, Gunter (Employee)
Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstr. 54
80636 München / DE
24.08.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
15.03.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.07.2002Date of oral proceedings
20.08.2002Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.08.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
20.04.2004Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/31]
20.04.2004Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition25.10.2002Appeal received No.  T1065/02
27.12.2002Statement of grounds filed
20.04.2004Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
16.10.2002Appeal received
08.11.2002Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2002/45]
20.11.2002Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2002/47]
20.04.2004Date of oral proceedings
03.05.2004Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
28.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
27.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
26.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
28.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.09.1999
ES08.09.1999
FR08.09.1999
GR08.09.1999
DK08.12.1999
LU07.06.2000
[2007/30]
Former [2006/14]AT08.09.1999
ES08.09.1999
FR08.09.1999
GR08.09.1999
DK08.12.1999
Former [2004/07]AT08.09.1999
ES08.09.1999
GR08.09.1999
DK08.12.1999
FR04.02.2000
Former [2003/45]AT08.09.1999
ES08.09.1999
DK08.12.1999
FR04.02.2000
Former [2002/25]AT08.09.1999
ES08.09.1999
FR04.02.2000
Former [2001/06]AT08.09.1999
FR04.02.2000
Former [2000/24]AT08.09.1999
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH01152054  ;
 [X]JPS62220330  ;
 [X]JPS63265626  ;
 [X]JPH01269530  ;
 [PX]JPH02194944  ;
 [PX]JPH0317252  ;
 [PX]JPH0364449  ;
 [X]EP0240571  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD.) [X] 1,3-5,9,12,18,29 * page 8, line 7 - line 14 *;
 [X]GB2210826  (BOWATER PACKAGING LTD) [X] 1,3-5,9,18,29 * claim - *;
 [A]JPH01283135
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (1989), vol. 89, no. 30, Database accession no. 89-215699, & JPH01152054 A 19890614 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10,12,14-22 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (1987), vol. 87, no. 44, Database accession no. 87-311068, & JPS62220330 A 19870928 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1-5,7,8,18,29 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (1988), vol. 88, no. 50, Database accession no. 88-356265, & JPS63265626 A 00000000 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,18 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890210), vol. 13, no. 60, Database accession no. (M - 796), & JP63265626 A 19881102 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1,2,4,5,12,14,15,17-20,22 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, (1989), vol. 89, no. 49, Database accession no. 89-360325, & JPH01269530 A 19891027 (TOPPAN PRINTING K.K.) [X] 1,4,5,8-10,12,14-20,22 * abstract *
 [PX]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (1990), vol. 90, no. 37, Database accession no. 90-278515, & JPH02194944 A 19900801 (TOPPAN PRINTING K.K.) [PX] 1,3,4,8,9,12,18-20,23,24,29 * abstract *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901019), vol. 14, no. 481, Database accession no. (M - 1037), & JP02194944 A 19900801 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO.LTD.) [PX] 1,3,4,8,9,12,18-20,23,24,29 * abstract *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910402), vol. 15, no. 133, Database accession no. (C - 0820), & JP03017252 A 19910125 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD.) [PX] 1,3,4,8,18,29 * abstract *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910604), vol. 15, no. 216, Database accession no. (C - 0837), & JP03064449 A 19910319 (REIKO CO. LTD.) [PX] 1,3,8,18,23,29 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900202), vol. 14, no. 58, Database accession no. (M - 930), & JP01283135 A 19891114 (MITSUBISHI MONSANTO CHEM CO.) [A] 1,18,23 * abstract *
ExaminationUS3442686