Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0460966 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0460966



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1225
08.07.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
08.06.2004 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
04.06.2004 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 27
03.05.2004 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 6
19.04.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
19.04.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
19.04.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
19.04.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
16.04.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.04.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
15.04.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
14.04.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
14.04.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.04.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 4
13.04.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.04.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
02.04.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
01.04.2004 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 3
01.04.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
25.03.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
25.03.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
25.03.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
25.03.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
25.03.2004 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
24.03.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.03.2004 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
22.03.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
21.03.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
19.03.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
13.02.2004 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
09.02.2004 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
21.01.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
21.01.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
20.01.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
20.01.2004 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
19.12.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.12.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
12.12.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
12.12.2003 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.10.2003 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
24.10.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
24.10.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.10.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.10.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.10.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
17.10.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
17.10.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
16.10.2003 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 12
02.10.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.08.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
21.08.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
31.07.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 18
31.07.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
31.07.2003 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
25.07.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 29
06.06.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.06.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
06.06.2003 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
28.05.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.05.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.05.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.01.2003 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
24.01.2003 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
24.01.2003 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
24.01.2003 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
24.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2003 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.01.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
21.01.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
03.01.2003 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
30.12.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
27.12.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
18.12.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
18.12.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 12
28.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.11.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.11.2002 Board of Appeal mail Appeal 1
20.11.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.11.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
08.11.2002 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 8
08.11.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
08.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.11.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.11.2002 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 2
30.10.2002 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.10.2002 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
30.10.2002 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
30.10.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.10.2002 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.10.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
29.10.2002 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
28.10.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.10.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.10.2002 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
28.10.2002 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.10.2002 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
28.10.2002 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
28.10.2002 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.10.2002 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.10.2002 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
28.10.2002 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
28.10.2002 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
28.10.2002 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
28.10.2002 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
28.10.2002 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 31
28.10.2002 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
28.10.2002 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
25.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.10.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
24.10.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.10.2002 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
23.10.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
23.10.2002 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
23.10.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
23.10.2002 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
16.10.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
16.10.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.10.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.10.2002 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
16.10.2002 Notice of appeal Opposition 2
16.10.2002 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.10.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
15.10.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
02.09.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.09.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.08.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
29.08.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.08.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.08.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.08.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.08.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.08.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
21.08.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.08.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 11
20.08.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 8
20.08.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
20.08.2002 Annex to a communication Opposition 3
20.08.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 4
20.08.2002 Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended Opposition 1
20.08.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 13
20.08.2002 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
20.08.2002 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.08.2002 Text intended for grant Opposition 16
18.07.2002 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 1
18.07.2002 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
18.07.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.07.2002 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.07.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
16.07.2002 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 2
09.07.2002 Annex Opposition 3
09.07.2002 Claims Opposition 3
09.07.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.07.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
08.07.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
08.07.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
05.07.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
05.07.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
29.05.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.05.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.05.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
27.05.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
23.05.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
22.05.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.05.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.05.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
22.05.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.05.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
08.05.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
08.05.2002 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 8
23.04.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.04.2002 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
15.04.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
25.01.2002 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.01.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.01.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
17.01.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.01.2002 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.01.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
15.01.2002 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.01.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
11.01.2002 Annex to the communication Opposition 7
11.01.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
11.01.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
11.01.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
20.12.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.07.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
27.06.2001 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 2
27.03.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
15.03.2001 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 6
15.03.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
05.03.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.03.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
27.02.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.02.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
03.01.2001 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
03.01.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.12.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
20.12.2000 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
24.08.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
24.08.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.08.2000 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
09.08.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 1
25.07.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) Opposition 2
14.07.2000 N/A Opposition 1
14.07.2000 N/A Opposition 1
16.06.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.06.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.06.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
08.06.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
08.06.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
08.06.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.06.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
08.06.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 3
08.06.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
08.06.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 31
08.06.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
08.06.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
07.06.2000 Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting Opposition 1
07.06.2000 General authorisation Opposition 1
07.06.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
07.06.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
07.06.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
07.06.2000 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
24.02.2000 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.01.2000 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
29.07.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
25.02.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.02.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
25.02.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
21.12.1998 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
10.12.1998 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
22.09.1998 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
22.09.1998 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
25.08.1998 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
30.07.1998 Claims Search / examination 3
30.07.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.06.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.06.1998 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
29.01.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.11.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.11.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
07.11.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
07.11.1997 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
06.11.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 9
31.07.1997 Annex Search / examination 2
31.07.1997 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.07.1997 Communication concerning signing of documents Search / examination 1
27.06.1997 Claims Search / examination 1
27.06.1997 Description Search / examination 1
27.06.1997 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.06.1997 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
27.06.1997 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
01.04.1997 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
13.03.1997 Description Search / examination 2
13.03.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
12.03.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 7
24.02.1997 Description Search / examination 7
24.02.1997 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.12.1996 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
20.12.1996 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
20.12.1996 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
20.12.1996 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
15.11.1996 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
10.10.1996 Claims Search / examination 3
10.10.1996 Description Search / examination 12
10.10.1996 Drawings Search / examination 2
10.10.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.10.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 18
03.06.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
19.04.1996 Claims Search / examination 4
19.04.1996 Description Search / examination 17
19.04.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
21.02.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.02.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.10.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
05.05.1995 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
22.11.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.11.1994 European search report Search / examination 3
03.08.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.10.1991 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
01.10.1991 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
28.09.1991 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
28.09.1991 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.09.1991 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
18.09.1991 Extension of time limit granted Search / examination 1
16.09.1991 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.09.1991 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
16.08.1991 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.08.1991 Priority document Search / examination 37
08.07.1991 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 2
19.06.1991 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
19.06.1991 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
07.06.1991 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.06.1991 Claims Search / examination 4
07.06.1991 Description Search / examination 22
07.06.1991 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.1991 Drawings Search / examination 4
07.06.1991 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.06.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
07.06.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
07.06.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
07.06.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
07.06.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
07.06.1991 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
07.06.1991 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6