Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0463889

EP0463889 - Electric-powered tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.1997
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.09.1997 [1997/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HITACHI KOKI CO., LTD.
6-2, Oote-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/01]For all designated states
HITACHI KOKI CO., LTD.
6-2, Oote-machi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Abo, Kimitaka
193-45, Sumiyoshi-cho
Mito-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
02 / Kikuchi, Junichi
1-6-11, Nagahori-cho
Katsuta-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
03 / Osada, Yoshio
1060, Takeda
Katsuta-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
[1992/01]
Representative(s)Senior, Alan Murray , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/01]Senior, Alan Murray , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date91305953.101.07.1991
[1992/01]
Priority number, dateJP1990007005729.06.1990         Original published format: JP 7005790
[1992/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0463889
Date:02.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0463889
Date:01.09.1993
Language:EN
[1993/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0463889
Date:11.09.1996
Language:EN
[1996/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.1993
ClassificationInternational:H01R39/38, H01R39/41, H02K5/14
[1993/35]
Former International [1992/01]H01R39/38
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   LI [1992/01]
TitleGerman:Elektrisch betriebenes Werkzeug[1992/01]
English:Electric-powered tool[1992/01]
French:Outil fonctionnant électriquement[1992/01]
Examination procedure06.12.1993Examination requested  [1994/05]
15.02.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.12.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.1996Fee for grant paid
19.03.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
07.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
11.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XP]US4963779  (LENTINO LYNN E [US], et al);
 [A]FR2321205  (SEV MARCHAL [FR]);
 [A]GB503229  (THOMAS DEVER SPENCER, et al)