Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0470760

EP0470760 - Composite plastics film or sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.03.1998
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.03.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.05.1998 [1998/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BXL Plastics Limited
BP House, Breakspear Way
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD, Herts HP2 4UL / GB
[1997/03]
Former [1993/22]For all designated states
BXL Plastics Limited
Britannic House 1 Finsbury Circus
London EC2M 7BA / GB
Former [1992/07]For all designated states
BXL Plastics Limited
Belgrave House, 76 Buckingham Palace Road
London SW1W 0SU / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Leese, Leonard
6 Valley Close, Brantham
Manningtree, Essex CO11 1GG / GB
02 / Yadav, Vijay
14309 Blue Granite Road
Pineville, North Carolina 28134 / US
[1992/07]
Representative(s)Krishnan, Suryanarayana Kalyana , et al
BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents & Agreements Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames
Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/07]Krishnan, Suryanarayana Kalyana , et al
BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents & Agreements Division Chertsey Road
Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB
Application number, filing date91307049.631.07.1991
[1992/07]
Priority number, dateGB1990001750009.08.1990         Original published format: GB 9017500
GB1990001805617.08.1990         Original published format: GB 9018056
[1992/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0470760
Date:12.02.1992
Language:EN
[1992/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0470760
Date:01.07.1992
Language:EN
[1992/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0470760
Date:14.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.1992
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/08
[1992/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1992/07]
TitleGerman:Verbundfilm oder Verbundblatt aus Kunststoff[1992/07]
English:Composite plastics film or sheet[1992/07]
French:Film ou feuille composite en plastique[1992/07]
Examination procedure21.11.1992Examination requested  [1993/03]
18.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
17.01.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.11.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.1996Fee for grant paid
22.11.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0216343  (HOECHST AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0137454  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]);
 [A]EP0321843  (HOECHST AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0127252  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US])
by applicantGB1470372
 GB1492771
 GB1490512
 GB2177413
 GB2099754
 US4582753
 US4702954
 US4377616
 GB2224973
 GB2177049
 EP0258020
 US4701370
 US4663216
 US4632869
 US4438175
 GB1374574
 GB1442113