Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0479510

EP0479510 - Image signal coding/decoding system using adaptive quantization [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2001
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.06.2001 [2001/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LTD.
12, Moriya-Cho 3-Chome, Kanagawa-Ku Yokohama-Shi
Kanagawa-Ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/15]For all designated states
VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LTD.
12, Moriya-Cho 3-Chome, Kanagawa-Ku
Yokohama-Shi, Kanagawa-Ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sugiyama, Kenji
20-10,4-Chome, Negishi-Cho
Yokosuka-Shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1992/15]
Representative(s)Crawford, Andrew Birkby , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/15]Crawford, Andrew Birkby , et al
A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date91308896.927.09.1991
[1992/15]
Priority number, dateJP1990026238929.09.1990         Original published format: JP 26238990
JP1991024500830.08.1991         Original published format: JP 24500891
[1992/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0479510
Date:08.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0479510
Date:13.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0479510
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.1994
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/30
[1999/42]
Former International [1992/15]G06F15/64
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/15]
TitleGerman:Bildsignalkodierer/Dekodierer mit adaptiver Quantisierung[1992/15]
English:Image signal coding/decoding system using adaptive quantization[1992/15]
French:Système de codage/décodage du signal image utilisant une quantification adaptative[1992/15]
Examination procedure13.11.1991Examination requested  [1992/15]
16.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.12.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2000Fee for grant paid
14.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/24]
Request for further processing for:09.03.1998Request for further processing filed
09.03.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.03.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
08.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
10.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
09.09.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0296608  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 30 - line 36 * * page 7, line 19 - line 25 *
 [XA]  Tu G et al, "Two approaches to transform coding using classified vector quantization", VISUAL COMMUNICATIONS AND IMAGE PROCESSING IV, PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA, 8-10 NOV. 1989, 570 - 577 PT.1, ISSN 0277-786X, [X] 4,5,9,10 * abstract * * page 574, line 13 - line 18 * [A] 1-3,6-8,11
 [XA]  Wen-Hsiung Chen et al, "Adaptive coding of monochrome and color images", IEEE TRANS. COMMUN. (USA), IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, NOV. 1977, USA, COM-25, 11, 1285 - 1292, ISSN 0090-6778, [X] 4,5,9,10 * page 1286, line 18 - page 1287, line 36; figure 3 * [A] 1-3,6-8,11