blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0479544

EP0479544 - Spring clutches and winders having clutches [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.04.1997
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.1997No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.05.1997 [1997/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Komatsu, Fumito
1632-12, Nomura, Oaza Hirooka Shiojiri-shi
Nagano 339-07 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/15]For all designated states
Komatsu, Fumito
1632-12, Nomura, Oaza Hirooka
Shiojiri-shi, Nagano-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1992/15]
Representative(s)Gura, Henry Alan, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
[1992/15]
Application number, filing date91308966.030.09.1991
[1992/15]
Priority number, dateJP1990026589302.10.1990         Original published format: JP 26589390
[1992/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0479544
Date:08.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0479544
Date:05.08.1992
Language:EN
[1992/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0479544
Date:22.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.06.1992
ClassificationIPC:F16D7/02, G11B15/50
[1992/15]
CPC:
G11B15/32 (EP,US); F16D19/00 (KR); F16D7/022 (EP,US);
G11B15/50 (EP,US); E05Y2201/49 (EP,US); E05Y2800/205 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/22 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/15]
TitleGerman:Federkupplungen und Spulenhülsen mit Kupplungen[1992/15]
English:Spring clutches and winders having clutches[1992/15]
French:Embrayages à ressort et bobinoirs avec embrayages[1996/21]
Former [1992/15]Embrayages à ressort et boninoirs avec embrayages
Examination procedure30.10.1992Examination requested  [1993/06]
25.07.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.11.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.11.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.1996Fee for grant paid
12.02.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.02.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2172066  (PHILIPS NV);
 [Y]US2009914  (BROWN FENBY T);
 [Y]GB1112489  (ASSOCIATED SPRING CORP);
 [Y]DE2441218  (ANVAR)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.