blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0479565

EP0479565 - Medical apparatus for endoscopic surgery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.1996
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cook Incorporated
925 South Curry Pike
Bloomington, IN 47402-0489 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/15]For all designated states
Cook Incorporated
925 South Curry Pike P.O. Box 489
Bloomington Indiana 47402 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Olsen, Douglas O.
5712 Spring House Way
Brentwood, Tennessee 37027 / US
02 / Bates, Brian L.
3718 Exeter Lane
Bloomington, Indiana 47401 / US
03 / Osborne, Thomas, A.
2418 Spicewood Lane
Bloomington, Indiana 47401 / US
[1992/15]
Representative(s)Johnston, Kenneth Graham
Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue
Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/15]Johnston, Kenneth Graham
5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB
Application number, filing date91309012.202.10.1991
[1992/15]
Priority number, dateUS1990059267603.10.1990         Original published format: US 592676
[1992/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0479565
Date:08.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0479565
Date:01.07.1992
Language:EN
[1992/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0479565
Date:20.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.1992
ClassificationIPC:A61B17/34, A61M29/00
[1992/15]
CPC:
A61B17/3417 (EP,US); A61M29/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1992/15]
TitleGerman:Medizinisches Gerät für endoskopische Chirurgie[1992/15]
English:Medical apparatus for endoscopic surgery[1992/15]
French:Appareil médical pour chirurgie endoscopique[1992/15]
Examination procedure01.10.1992Examination requested  [1992/49]
04.10.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.11.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.06.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.1995Fee for grant paid
15.08.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.09.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
02.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES20.12.1995
FR20.12.1995
IT20.12.1995
DE21.03.1996
[2006/14]
Former [2002/25]ES20.12.1995
IT20.12.1995
DE21.03.1996
FR15.05.1996
Former [1999/42]IT20.12.1995
DE21.03.1996
FR15.05.1996
Former [1996/42]DE21.03.1996
FR15.05.1996
Former [1996/28]DE21.03.1996
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2144070  ;
 [X]EP0206553  (STREATFIELD GILL STEVEN [GB], et al);
 [X]US4498902  (ASH STEPHEN R [US], et al);
 [A]US3994287  (TURP GERALD, et al);
 [A]EP0339945  (ADAIR EDWIN LLOYD);
 [A]DE836546  (JOSEF BERCHTOLD)
 [A]  - DERWENT WPIL, Derwent Publication Limited, London, GB; & JP-A-2 144 070 (PN), & JP2144070 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.