Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0480755

EP0480755 - Document processing method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.11.2000
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.01.2001 [2001/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/16]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimizu, Haruo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1992/16]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/16]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date91309391.011.10.1991
[1992/16]
Priority number, dateJP1990027216112.10.1990         Original published format: JP 27216190
[1992/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0480755
Date:15.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0480755
Date:10.11.1993
Language:EN
[1993/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0480755
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.1993
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/00
[1998/36]
Former International [1992/16]G06F15/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/16]
TitleGerman:Dokumentverarbeitungsverfahren und -gerät[1992/16]
English:Document processing method and apparatus[1992/16]
French:Procédé et appareil de traitement de documents[1992/16]
Examination procedure25.03.1994Examination requested  [1994/21]
10.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
26.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.07.1999Fee for grant paid
07.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01]
Request for further processing for:26.06.1997Request for further processing filed
26.06.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.07.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
23.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
20.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
22.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]  INFORMATIONSTECHNIK IT vol. 28, no. 6, 1986, MÜNCHEN, DE pages 342 - 347 W. APPELT 'Die Integration von TEX in eine interaktive Textverarbeitungsumgebung'
 [X]  IBM SYSTEMS JOURNAL vol. 21, no. 3, 1982, ARMONK, NEW YORK US pages 250 - 271 D.D. CHAMBERLIN ET AL 'JANUS: An interactive document formatter based on declarative tags'