Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0481736

EP0481736 - Method of making an organic resin multi-layer wiring substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1992/17]Organic resin multi-layer wiring substrate and method of making the same
[1998/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.12.2000
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.01.2001 [2001/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1992/17]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kimbara, Kohji, c/o NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1992/17]
Representative(s)Abnett, Richard Charles , et al
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London
WC1X 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/17]Abnett, Richard Charles , et al
REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date91309498.316.10.1991
[1992/17]
Priority number, dateJP1990027810917.10.1990         Original published format: JP 27810990
[1992/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0481736
Date:22.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0481736
Date:22.07.1992
Language:EN
[1992/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0481736
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.1992
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/48, H01L23/538
[1998/32]
Former International [1992/17]H01L23/538, H01L21/48
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1992/17]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Mehrschicht-Leitersubstrats aus organischem Harz[1998/32]
English:Method of making an organic resin multi-layer wiring substrate[1998/32]
French:Procédé de la fabrication d'un substrat multi-couche de conducteurs à résine organique et procédé de sa fabrication[1998/32]
Former [1992/17]Mehrschicht-Leitersubstrat aus organischem Harz und Verfahren zum Herstellen desselben
Former [1992/17]Organic resin multi-layer wiring substrate and method of making the same
Former [1992/17]Substrat multi-couche de conducteurs à résine organique et procédé de sa fabrication
Examination procedure04.11.1991Examination requested  [1992/17]
21.09.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.03.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.05.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
16.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
27.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.1999Fee for grant paid
27.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
29.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
28.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[X]US4812191  (HO CHUNG W [US], et al);
 [Y]EP0327398  (RAYCHEM LTD [GB])