blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0481776

EP0481776 - TAB board and non-contact IC card which uses the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.11.1998
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.12.1998 [1998/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/17]For all designated states
MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujioka, Shuzo, c/o Mitsubishi Elec. Semiconductor
Software Corporation Kitaitami Jigyosho
1 Mizuhara 4-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
02 / Takahira, Kenichi, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K. K.
Kitaitami Seisakusho, 1, Mizuhara 4-chome
Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP
[1992/17]
Representative(s)Mounteney, Simon James, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/52]Mounteney, Simon James, et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Former [1992/17]Lawson, David Glynne, et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date91309570.917.10.1991
[1992/17]
Priority number, dateJP1990027654817.10.1990         Original published format: JP 27654890
[1992/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0481776
Date:22.04.1992
Language:EN
[1992/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0481776
Date:03.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0481776
Date:29.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.01.1993
ClassificationIPC:G06K19/077, G06K19/07
[1993/09]
CPC:
G06K19/07749 (EP); G06K19/07779 (EP); G06K19/07783 (EP)
Former IPC [1992/17]G06K19/07
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/17]
TitleGerman:TAB-Band und kontaktfreie IC-Karte, für die dieses Band Verwendung findet[1992/17]
English:TAB board and non-contact IC card which uses the same[1992/17]
French:Bande TAB et carte à circuits imprimés l'utilisant[1992/17]
Examination procedure01.09.1993Examination requested  [1993/43]
15.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.04.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.07.1997Fee for grant paid
25.07.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
08.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
09.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
10.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP62134780  ;
 [A]JP61226887  ;
 [A]JP62008283  ;
 [Y]EP0376062  (EBAUCHESFABRIK ETA AG [CH])
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 358 (P-639)(2805) 21 November 1987 & JP-A-62 134 780 ( HITACHI LTD ) 17 June 1987, & JP62134780 A 19870617
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 62 (P-551)(2509) 25 February 1987 & JP-A-61 226 887 ( ANRITSU ) 8 October 1986, & JP61226887 A 19861008
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 178 (P-584)(2625) 9 June 1987 & JP-A-62 008 283 ( MATSUSHITA ) 16 January 1987, & JP62008283 A 19870116
by applicantEP0376062
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.